Johnson v. Roundtree Automotive Group et al

Plaintiff: D'lon V Johnson and D'lon Vincent Johnson
Defendant: Roundtree Automotive, Timothy Soifert, Kevin Dean, Roundtree Automotive Group, Kyle Bettilyon and Marc Grumbach
Case Number: 3:2019cv00057
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
0 Judge: David L Horan
1 Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. Tue Mar 5 12:40:06 CST 2019 (crt)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should dismiss this action with prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 3/5/2019) (mla)
February 12, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. Tue Feb 12 13:20:55 CST 2019 (crt)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Roundtree Automotive Group, Kyle Bettilyon, Marc Grumbach, Kevin Dean, Timothy Soifert filed by D'lon Vincent Johnson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mla)
January 11, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Fri Jan 11 12:22:24 CST 2019 (crt)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER: D'lon V Johnson must address the following deficiency: The complaint does not comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8(a). Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 2/11/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/11/2019) (Attachments: #1 Complaint Form) (axm)
January 11, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Fri Jan 11 12:04:17 CST 2019 (crt)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. But service of process shall not issue, if at all, until the Court completes its screening of this action under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/11/2019) (axm)
January 9, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Wed Jan 9 17:00:25 CST 2019 (crt)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Change Defendant Name to Correct filed by D'lon V Johnson. (epm)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by D'lon V Johnson. (epm)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by D'lon V Johnson. (epm)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Roundtree Automotive filed by D'lon V Johnson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (epm)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (epm)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Roundtree Automotive Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roundtree Automotive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Soifert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roundtree Automotive Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Bettilyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Grumbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'lon V Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'lon Vincent Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?