Muratalla v. ALDI (Texas) LLC

Plaintiff: Maria Estela Prado De Muratalla
Defendant: ALDI (Texas) LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00068
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time for Membership Application. Plaintiff's counsel's time to apply for membership to the Bar of this court or for admission pro hac vice is EXTENDED to 2/28/2019. No further extensions will be granted. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 2/1/2019) (zkc)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Maria Estela Prado De Muratalla (Clark, Michael) Modified text to match document and termed motion on 1/30/2019 (dsr).
January 30, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION to Extend Time for Membership Application Approval filed by Maria Estela Prado De Muratalla. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order - Membership Application) (Clark, Michael)
January 15, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5, 6. Tue Jan 15 11:29:31 CST 2019 (crt)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: No later than 20 days after this order is filed, the plaintiff must comply with Rule 3.1(c) or 3.2(e) so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 1/14/2019) (rekc)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Within 15 days of the date of this order, counsel shall either (1) provide to the court, and to the clerk of court, satisfactory documentation of membership or (2) apply for membership in the Bar of this court or for admission pro hac vice for this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 1/14/2019) (rekc)
January 9, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Wed Jan 9 16:07:27 CST 2019 (crt)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (aaa)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing of Removal re: #2 Notice (Other), #1 Notice of Removal filed by ALDI (Texas) LLC (Sargent, David)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing of Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by ALDI (Texas) LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Defendant's Answer, #2 Exhibit(s) Jury Demand) (Sargent, David)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by ALDI (Texas) LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9695007) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Exhibit(s) Index of State Court File, #3 Exhibit(s) State Court case file, #4 Exhibit(s) COIP, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Cover Sheet Supplement, #7 Exhibit(s) Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Sargent, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muratalla v. ALDI (Texas) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALDI (Texas) LLC
Represented By: David L Sargent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Estela Prado De Muratalla
Represented By: Michael Clark
Represented By: Michael Sutton Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?