Roor International BV et al v. GMD Business Group LLC et al

Plaintiff: Roor International BV, Sream Inc and GMD Business Group LLC
Defendant: Deepak Thapa, Roshan Kc and Meena Kc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00075
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendants GMD BUSINESS GROUP, LLC d/b/a BROADWAY TOBACCO BEE, DEEPAK THAPA, MEENA KC and ROSHAN KC response to the complaint is due April 1, 2019. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/1/2019) (chmb)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by GMD Business Group LLC, Meena Kc, Roshan Kc, Deepak Thapa Attorney Patrick C Canon added to party GMD Business Group LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick C Canon added to party Meena Kc(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick C Canon added to party Roshan Kc(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick C Canon added to party Deepak Thapa(pty:dft) (Canon, Patrick)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Roor International BV, Sream Inc. (Jacoby, Andrew) (Main Document 6 replaced on 1/14/2019) (dss).
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David C Godbey for all further proceedings. Judge Jane J. Boyle no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/10/2019) (mla)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (ala)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GMD Business Group LLC, Meena Kc, Roshan Kc, Deepak Thapa. (ala)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ala)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GMD Business Group LLC, Meena Kc, Roshan Kc, Deepak Thapa filed by Roor International BV, Sream Inc. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9696829) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E) (Jacoby, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. GMD Business Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Andrew Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream Inc
Represented By: Andrew Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GMD Business Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deepak Thapa
Represented By: Patrick C Canon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roshan Kc
Represented By: Patrick C Canon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meena Kc
Represented By: Patrick C Canon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?