Roor International BV et al v. KKRGL Inc et al

Plaintiff: Sream Inc and Roor International BV
Defendant: KKRGL Inc and Khawaja A Ahmed
Case Number: 3:2019cv00080
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Referring Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT Per Rule 26(f) filed by Roor International BV, Sream Inc. (Jacoby, Andrew)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/25/2019) (ykp)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Khawaja A Ahmed, KKRGL Inc. (Ashmore, KC)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 Original ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Khawaja A Ahmed, KKRGL Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Khawaja A Ahmed, KKRGL IncAttorney KC Ashmore added to party Khawaja A Ahmed(pty:dft), Attorney KC Ashmore added to party KKRGL Inc(pty:dft) (Ashmore, KC)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Khawaja A Ahmed ; served on 2/4/2019; KKRGL Inc ; served on 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (Jacoby, Andrew)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Roor International BV, Sream Inc. (Jacoby, Andrew)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TRANSFER ORDER. Case reassigned to Judge David C Godbey for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 1/10/2019) (mla)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Khawaja A Ahmed, KKRGL Inc. (mla)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (mla)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Khawaja A Ahmed, KKRGL Inc filed by Roor International BV, Sream Inc. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9696970) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E) (Jacoby, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. KKRGL Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream Inc
Represented By: Andrew Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Andrew Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KKRGL Inc
Represented By: KC Ashmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khawaja A Ahmed
Represented By: KC Ashmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?