Dixon v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Alan Dixon
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00085
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re: #12 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims asserted against the United States of America in the above-styled and -numbered civil action are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with costs taxed against the party incurring the same. The Court hereby ORDERS that the United States of America's #11 Motion to Dismiss be DENIED as MOOT. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 2/12/2019) (axm)
February 11, 2019 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Alan Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Magan, Kathryn)
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction /United States of America's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by United States of America with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Thomas M Herrin added to party United States of America(pty:dft) (Herrin, Thomas)
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States of America ; served on 1/14/2019. (Magan, Kathryn)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Second Motion Seal Documents. The Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to SEAL Exhibits A, B, C, D, E, F, and H attached to Plaintiffs Original Complaint. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 1/22/2019) (mla)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Seal Document. The Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to replace the filing of Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Original Complaint with Plaintiff's redacted version of Exhibit A (attached to Document #6 ). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 1/16/2019) (mla)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiff's Second MOTION to Seal Documents re #1 Complaint filed by Alan Dixon (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Magan, Kathryn)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Seal Document re #1 Complaint filed by Alan Dixon (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A redacted, #2 Proposed Order) (Magan, Kathryn)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff shall provide the Court with a courtesy copy of Plaintiff's Exhibit A attached to the Original Complaint [Doc 1-2] filed 1/10/2019, on or before 3:00 p.m. on 2/4/2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 1/15/2019) (ykp)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ala)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ala)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alan Dixon. (Magan, Kathryn)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America filed by Alan Dixon. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9698274) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet , #2 (Document Restricted) Exhibit A, #3 (Document Restricted) Exhibit B, #4 (Document Restricted) Exhibit C, #5 (Document Restricted) Exhibit D, #6 (Document Restricted) Exhibit E, #7 (Document Restricted) Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 (Document Restricted) Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I) (Magan, Kathryn) Modified defendant on 1/10/2019 (ala). (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/16/2019 per #8 Order) (mla). Modified security per #7 motion to seal on 1/17/2019 (mla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Dixon
Represented By: Kathryn Magan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas M Herrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?