Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Company et al v. Parker-Hannifin Corporation

Plaintiff: Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Company
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00087
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT RE: SETTLEMENT filed by Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Company. (Hazan-Cohen, Marcos)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for three-week docket beginning 4/27/2020 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. Joinder of Parties due by 3/11/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 3/11/2019. Motions due by 12/2/2019. Fact and Expert Discovery due by 11/1/2019. Settlement Status Report due by 3/11/2019. Pretrial Order due by 4/6/2020. Pretrial Materials due by 4/6/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 4/24/2020 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/19/2019) (axm) (Main Document 8 replaced on 2/21/2019 to added extension number) (axm).
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Company. (Hazan-Cohen, Marcos)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Company. (Hazan-Cohen, Marcos)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 2/13/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 1/16/2019) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Consent to Proceed) (aaa)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Quillin, Edward)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ala)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Quillin, Edward)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 68th District Court, Dallas County, case number DC-18-15912 filed by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9698810) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Quillin, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Company et al v. Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Marcos Hazan-Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: T B Nicholas, Jr
Represented By: Edward P Quillin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?