Wilson v. Kaufman County Jail

Plaintiff: Ann Marie Wilson
Defendant: Kaufman County Jail and Sheriff Brian Beavers
Case Number: 3:2019cv00122
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:15. Tue Mar 12 11:20:55 CDT 2019 (crt)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying without prejudice #12 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 3/12/2019) (mla)
March 11, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE filed by Ann Marie Wilson re: #10 Judge's Questionnaire. (epm)
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 Correspondence filed, deputy clerk response attached, received from Ann Marie Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Response) (epm) Modified security on 2/27/2019 per U.S. Magistrate Judge due to personal identifiers on document (ctf).
February 26, 2019 PLEASE DISREGARD-printed in error ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9,10,11. Tue Feb 26 17:29:24 CST 2019 (crt) Modified on 2/26/2019 (epm).
February 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Ann Marie Wilson. (aaa)
February 19, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9,10,11. Tue Feb 19 10:58:47 CST 2019 (crt)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying without prejudice #8 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 2/19/2019) (aaa)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Judge's Questionnaire sent to Ann Marie Wilson. Deadline to respond to the questionnaire is 30 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 2/19/2019) (aaa)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Clerk to mail this order to the attention of the Inmate Trust Fund Department at the facility where the inmate resides. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 2/19/2019) (aaa)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Ann Marie Wilson. (mla)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ann Marie Wilson. (mla)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ann Marie Wilson. (mla)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kaufman County Jail, Brian Beavers filed by Ann Marie Wilson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mla) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/13/2019) (mla). Modified to add party on 2/14/2019 (zkc).
January 18, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 4. Fri Jan 18 10:29:49 CST 2019 (crt)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Ann Marie Wilson must address the following deficiency: The $400 fee has not been paid nor has a proper request to proceed in forma pauperis been submitted. A request to proceed in forma pauperis must include a certified statement of the balance in plaintiffs inmate trust account for the six-month period preceding the filing of the complaint. Civil rights pleadings are not filed on the appropriate form. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 1/17/2019) (Attachments: #1 IFP, #2 1983) (rekc)
January 16, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Wed Jan 16 10:18:05 CST 2019 (crt)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Kaufman County Jail filed by Ann Marie Wilson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (rekc)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (rekc)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Kaufman County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Marie Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaufman County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Brian Beavers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?