Morgan v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth Morgan
Defendant: Jane Doe and Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00130
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Referring Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for jury trial on this Court's three-week docket beginning 3/2/2020 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. Joinder of Parties due by 5/6/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 8/6/2019. Motions due by 11/25/2019. All Fact and Expert Discovery due by 11/25/2019. Settlement Status Report due by 8/6/2019. Pretrial Order due by 2/10/2020. Pretrial Materials due by 2/10/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2020 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/15/2019) (zkc)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT and Scheduling Order Proposal filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Davis, Derek)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc (Davis, Derek)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 2/26/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/5/2019) (axm)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Court Request for Recusal: Judge Sam A Lindsay recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:19-cv-130-M. (ctf)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Davis, Derek)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from County Court at Law No 5, Dallas County, TX, case number CC-18-06822-E filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9713031) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Davis, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Represented By: Derek Ryan Staub
Represented By: Derek S Davis
Represented By: Samuel Hunter Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Morgan
Represented By: Stephen C Pipkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?