Minka Lighting Inc v. Wind River Ceiling Fans LLC et al

Plaintiff: Minka Lighting, Inc. and Minka Lighting Inc
Defendant: Wind River Ceiling Fans LLC, Summer Wind International LLC and President Monte Hall
Case Number: 3:2019cv00159
Filed: January 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Referring Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Waive Local Counsel Requirement filed by Minka Lighting Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Meyerhoff, Lisa)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER FOR PATENT CASE: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 4/4/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/14/2019) (zkc)
March 14, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Monte Hall, Summer Wind International LLC, Wind River Ceiling Fans LLC. (Pegues, Michael)
March 12, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Wind River Ceiling Fans LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Michael D Pegues added to party Wind River Ceiling Fans LLC(pty:dft) (Pegues, Michael).
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Monte Hall. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Michael D Pegues added to party Monte Hall(pty:dft) (Pegues, Michael).
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Summer Wind International LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Michael D Pegues added to party Summer Wind International LLC(pty:dft) (Pegues, Michael).
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Summer Wind International LLC ; served on 2/20/2019. (Meyerhoff, Lisa)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Monte Hall ; served on 1/29/2019. (Meyerhoff, Lisa)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Wind River Ceiling Fans LLC ; served on 1/29/2019. (Meyerhoff, Lisa) Modified date on 2/19/2019 (ndt).
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Monte Hall, Summer Wind International LLC, Wind River Ceiling Fans LLC. (zkc)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Minka Lighting Inc. (Meyerhoff, Lisa)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action to Monte Hall filed by Minka Lighting Inc. (Meyerhoff, Lisa)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action to Summer Wind International LLC filed by Minka Lighting Inc. (Meyerhoff, Lisa)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action to Wind River Ceiling Fans LLC filed by Minka Lighting Inc. (Meyerhoff, Lisa)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (epm)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm)
January 22, 2019 Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn added pursuant to Special Order 3-287. Judge Karen Gren Scholer no longer assigned to case. (ewd)
January 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Minka Lighting, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9720686) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Cover Sheet) (Meyerhoff, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minka Lighting Inc v. Wind River Ceiling Fans LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wind River Ceiling Fans LLC
Represented By: Michael D Pegues
Represented By: Michael Midey Besser
Represented By: Jason A Wietjes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summer Wind International LLC
Represented By: Michael D Pegues
Represented By: Michael Midey Besser
Represented By: Jason A Wietjes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President Monte Hall
Represented By: Michael D Pegues
Represented By: Michael Midey Besser
Represented By: Jason A Wietjes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minka Lighting, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa H Meyerhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minka Lighting Inc
Represented By: Lisa H Meyerhoff
Represented By: Myall S Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?