Acosta v. Kroger Texas, L.P.

Plaintiff: Trina Acosta
Defendant: Kroger Texas LP
Case Number: 3:2019cv00296
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Potential Trial Conflicts filed by Trina Acosta (Schorr, Geoffrey)
March 22, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Potential Trial Conflicts filed by Trina Acosta (Schorr, Geoffrey)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for Cour's three-week docket beginning 1/21/2020 at 9:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. Joinder of Parties due by 3/8/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 5/3/2019. Motions due by 9/27/2019. Discovery due by 8/9/2019. Settlement Status Report due by 5/3/2019. Pretrial Order due by 12/30/2019. Pretrial Materials due by 12/30/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 1/15/2020 at 9:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/12/2019) (aaa) Modified on 3/25/2019 (chmb).
February 27, 2019 Filing 17 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Kroger Texas LP. (Stumbaugh, Michael)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Report due by 2/27/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/6/2019) (rekc)
February 5, 2019 Filing 15 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc)
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 4:18-cv-00845. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
February 4, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to the NORTHERN District of TEXAS DALLAS Division. (baf, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/5/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - GRANTING #8 Motion to Change Venue. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this case shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas Dallas Division. As this motion is unopposed, the Clerk is directed to transfer this case without delay.. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/4/2019. (baf, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/5/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2019 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Amended Pleadings due by 4/29/2019 for Plaintiff and by 5/24/2019 for Defendant. Discovery due by 7/26/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 3/8/2019. Mediation Completion due by 11/15/2019. Designation of Mediator due by 10/4/2019. Motions to dismiss, motions for summary judgment, or other dispositive motions due by 5/24/2019. Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law due by 11/22/2019. Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 11/6/2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/28/2019. (baf, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/5/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Due to the Court's docket, the January 25, 2018 Scheduling Conference is CANCELED. The Court will enter a Scheduling Order. (tls) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/5/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Stumbaugh, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/5/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Kroger Texas, L.P.. (Stumbaugh, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/5/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Kroger Texas, L.P. (Stumbaugh, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/5/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue Re-Urged After Removal from State Court by Kroger Texas, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - P's Orig Pet, #2 Exhibit B - P's Am Comp., #3 Exhibit C - Citation, #4 Exhibit D - D's Mtn to Trans Venue, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Stumbaugh, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/5/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kroger Texas, L.P., filed by Trina Acosta.(Schorr, Geoffrey) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/5/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 1/25/2019 at 11:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 1/16/2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/7/2018. (baf, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/5/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND ADVISORY re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Kroger Texas, L.P.. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/6/2018. (baf, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/5/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 ***ANSWER FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Kroger Texas, L.P..(baf, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/5/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 ***COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against Kroger Texas, L.P., filed by Trina Acosta.(baf, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/5/2019.]
December 4, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/5/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/5/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Kroger Texas, L.P. re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Interested Persons (Stumbaugh, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/5/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kroger Texas, L.P. from 380th Judicial District Court, Collin County, Texas, case number 380-05727-2018. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7048689), filed by Kroger Texas, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 2 - P's Orig Petition, #4 Exhibit 3 - D's Ans. Orig and MTV, #5 Exhibit 4 - Process and Orders, #6 Exhibit 5 - Case Info. Sheet, #7 Exhibit 6 - Civil Cover Sheet)(Briscoe, Bryan) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. Kroger Texas, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trina Acosta
Represented By: Geoffrey E Schorr
Represented By: A Jared Aldinger
Represented By: Hutton W Sentell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Texas LP
Represented By: Michael W Stumbaugh, II
Represented By: B Kyle Briscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?