Merge Office Interiors Inc v. Alfa Adhesives Inc

Plaintiff: Merge Office Interiors Inc
Defendant: Alfa Adhesives Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00336
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 12 Second AMENDED ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Alfa Adhesives Inc, COUNTERCLAIM against Merge Office Interiors Inc filed by Alfa Adhesives Inc (Walker, James)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Alfa Adhesives Inc filed by Merge Office Interiors Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Redline Comparison Between Original Petition and Amended Complaint) (Champion, Austin)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's AMENDED ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, with Jury Demand filed by Alfa Adhesives Inc, COUNTERCLAIM against Merge Office Interiors Inc filed by Alfa Adhesives Inc (Walker, James).
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Merge Office Interiors Inc. (Champion, Austin) (Main Document 9 replaced with flattened image on 3/20/2019) (ajb).
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alfa Adhesives Inc. (Walker, James)
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Alfa Adhesives Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against Merge Office Interiors Inc filed by Alfa Adhesives Inc (Walker, James)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/26/2019 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. Joinder of Parties due by 4/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2019. Fact and Expert Discovery due by 6/28/2019. Settlement Status Report due by 4/19/2019. Pretrial Order due by 8/5/2019. Pretrial Materials due by 8/5/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2019 08:30 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/4/2019) (rekc)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dale Owen Fresch on behalf of Merge Office Interiors Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Fresch, Dale)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alfa Adhesives Inc. (Walker, James)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), Rule 26, and the Court's Civil Justice Expense and Delay Reduction Plan (the "Plan"), the Court enters this Order to promote possible early settlement of this action and to facilitate subsequent entry of a Scheduling Order. Joint Report due by 3/6/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/13/2019) (ndt)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 44th Judicial District Court, Dallas County, TX, case number DC-19-00805 filed by Alfa Adhesives Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9771325) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s): Pleadings, Process Order, etc, #2 Cover Sheet) (Walker, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merge Office Interiors Inc v. Alfa Adhesives Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merge Office Interiors Inc
Represented By: Austin Champion
Represented By: Dale Owen Fresch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Adhesives Inc
Represented By: James W Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?