United States of America v. Melby et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jacalyn Lisa Melby, ORHub Inc, Castillo De Coachella LLC, Travis L Bowen, Global Security Holding LLC, Prestamo LLC, Castillo Misterio LLC, Prestamo En Pantalla LLC, Bowen Law Professional Group, Colton Ronald Melby, Bone Logic LLC, EarthNow Investments LLC and Jacalyn Lisa Gaman
Case Number: 3:2019cv00355
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Colton Ronald Melby, Jacalyn Lisa Melby. (Coffin, David)
April 6, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Colton Ronald Melby, Jacalyn Lisa Melby. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Coffin, David)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint. Jacalyn Lisa Melby answer due 4/15/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/18/2019) (zkc) Modified on 3/25/2019 (chmb).
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Jacalyn Lisa Melby (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney David Brandon Coffin added to party Jacalyn Lisa Melby(pty:dft) (Coffin, David)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Travis L Bowen answer due 4/13/2019; Bowen Law Professional Group answer due 4/13/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/14/2019) (epm)
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 First Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Travis L Bowen, Bowen Law Professional Group (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Travis Lyle Bowen, Jr added to party Travis L Bowen(pty:dft), Attorney Travis Lyle Bowen, Jr added to party Bowen Law Professional Group(pty:dft) (Bowen, Travis)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Curtis C Smith on behalf of United States of America. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Smith, Curtis)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Unoppsed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. IT IS ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant Melby to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 4/7/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/11/2019) (aaa)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Colton Ronald Melby (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend)Attorney David Brandon Coffin added to party Colton Ronald Melby(pty:dft) (Coffin, David)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bone Logic LLC, Travis L Bowen, Bowen Law Professional Group, Castillo De Coachella LLC, Castillo Misterio LLC, EarthNow Investments LLC, Global Security Holding LLC, Colton Ronald Melby, Jacalyn Lisa Melby, ORHub Inc, Prestamo En Pantalla LLC, Prestamo LLC. (rekc)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America. (Notinger, Ramona)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summonses to All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Notinger, Ramona) (Main Document 2 replaced with flattened pdf on 2/13/2019) (rekc).
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Cover Sheet) (Notinger, Ramona) (Attachment 2 replaced with flattened pdf on 2/13/2019) (rekc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Melby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacalyn Lisa Melby
Represented By: David Brandon Coffin
Represented By: Louise Parks Hytken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORHub Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castillo De Coachella LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis L Bowen
Represented By: Travis Lyle Bowen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Security Holding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestamo LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castillo Misterio LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestamo En Pantalla LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowen Law Professional Group
Represented By: Travis Lyle Bowen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colton Ronald Melby
Represented By: David Brandon Coffin
Represented By: Louise Parks Hytken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bone Logic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EarthNow Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacalyn Lisa Gaman
Represented By: David Brandon Coffin
Represented By: Louise Parks Hytken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Ramona S Notinger
Represented By: Curtis C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?