Retana et al v. Twitter Inc et al

Plaintiff: Jesus Retana and Andrew Moss
Defendant: Facebook Inc, Twitter Inc and Google LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00359
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 23 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Lauren Gallo White (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9916724) filed by Google LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (Fuller, Marc)
April 12, 2019 Filing 22 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Brian M. Willen (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9916680) filed by Google LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (Fuller, Marc)
April 12, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily Schomburger Johnson on behalf of Google LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Johnson, Emily)
April 12, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Fuller on behalf of Google LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Fuller, Marc)
April 12, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas S Leatherbury on behalf of Google LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Leatherbury, Thomas)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #17 the parties' Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. The Court hereby enters the following pleading deadlines. Plaintiffs amended complaint, if any, is due on or before April 15, 2019; and Defendants answers or other responsive pleadings to Plaintiffs amended complaint, if any, are due on or before May 13, 2019. If Plaintiffs however fail to file an amended complaint by April 15, 2019, Defendants must file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs current complaint on or before May 3, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/12/2019) (chmb)
April 12, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Extend Time and Amend Responsive Pleadings Deadlines filed by Twitter Inc (Joiner, Jamison)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ari Holtzblatt. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/12/2019) (chmb)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jack Starcher. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/12/2019) (chmb)
April 11, 2019 Filing 14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Ari Holtzblatt (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9913035) filed by Twitter Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit(s) Letter Explaining Temporary Suspension) (Joiner, Jamison)
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Jack Starcher (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9912963) filed by Twitter Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (Joiner, Jamison)
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jamison Joiner on behalf of Twitter Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Joiner, Jamison)
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Patrick LeGrand on behalf of Facebook Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (LeGrand, Andrew)
April 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Veronica S Lewis on behalf of Facebook Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Lewis, Veronica)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Twitter Inc. Waiver sent on 2/18/2019. (Altman, Keith)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Google LLC. Waiver sent on 2/18/2019. (Altman, Keith)
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Facebook Inc. Waiver sent on 2/18/2019. (Altman, Keith) Modified date waiver sent on 3/14/2019 (dsr).
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Keith Altman. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 2/13/2019) (chmb)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Facebook Inc, Google LLC, Twitter Inc. (zkc)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9778179) filed by Andrew Moss, Jesus Retana (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) Cert of Good Standing) (Altman, Keith)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Andrew Moss, Jesus Retana. (Altman, Keith)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Facebook Inc, Google LLC, Twitter Inc filed by Jesus Retana, Andrew Moss. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9778076) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Altman, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Retana et al v. Twitter Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc
Represented By: Veronica S Lewis
Represented By: Andrew Patrick LeGrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter Inc
Represented By: Ari Holtzblatt
Represented By: Jack Starcher
Represented By: Robert P Latham
Represented By: Jamison Joiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Marc A Fuller
Represented By: Emily Schomburger Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Retana
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Represented By: Michael D Richardson
Represented By: Ari Kresch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Moss
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Represented By: Michael D Richardson
Represented By: Ari Kresch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?