Coding Technologies LLC v. Cargill Incorporated

Plaintiff: Coding Technologies, LLC and Coding Technologies LLC
Defendant: Cargill, Incorporated and Cargill Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv00363
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER IN PATENT CASES: Lead counsel for each party (or designee attorney with appropriate authority) and any unrepresented party (except for a prisoner litigant proceeding pro se) shall confer as soon as practicable, but in no event later than 20 days from the date of this order. The Joint Report, which shall be filed no later than 10 days from the date of the scheduling conference. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/3/2019) (ykp)
April 3, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil J McNabnay on behalf of Cargill Incorporated. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (McNabnay, Neil)
April 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Theresa M Dawson on behalf of Cargill Incorporated. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Dawson, Theresa)
April 3, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cargill Incorporated. (Bonilla, Ricardo)
April 3, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Cargill Incorporated. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against Coding Technologies LLC filed by Cargill Incorporated (Bonilla, Ricardo)
April 3, 2019 Filing 12 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Cargill Incorporated re #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Bonilla, Ricardo)
April 3, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cargill Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Ricardo Joel Bonilla added to party Cargill Incorporated(pty:dft) (Bonilla, Ricardo)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Defendant Cargill Inc., shall have their Local Counsel (who is listed in Mr. Davis' PHV Application) file an appearance in this action within 3 days from the date of this order, pursuant to Local Rule 83.10(a). The Court reminds lead counsel that Local Counsel must also sign all documents submitted on behalf of Defendant Cargill, Inc. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/2/2019) (chmb)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ahmed J Davis. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/2/2019) (chmb)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9888159) filed by Cargill Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Virginia, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - DC, #3 Proposed Order)Attorney Ahmed J Davis added to party Cargill Incorporated(pty:dft) (Davis, Ahmed)
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Cargill Incorporated ; served on 3/13/2019. (Johnson, Jay)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint against Cargill Incorporated filed by Coding Technologies LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A) (Johnson, Jay)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Cargill Incorporated. (zkc)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (zkc)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Coding Technologies LLC. (Johnson, Jay)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Cargill Incorporated filed by Coding Technologies LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9779066) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (Johnson, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coding Technologies LLC v. Cargill Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coding Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Jay B Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coding Technologies LLC
Represented By: Jay B Johnson
Represented By: D Bradley Kizzia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Incorporated
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Theresa M Dawson
Represented By: Ricardo Joel Bonilla
Represented By: Ahmed J Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?