Arch Insurance Company v. National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford et al
Plaintiff: Arch Insurance Company
Defendant: National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, Valley Forge Insurance Company, Continental Casualty Company and Continental Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00373
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference for 4/25/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/5/2019) (zkc)
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Continental Casualty Company, Continental Insurance Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, Valley Forge Insurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Dunlop Gates, Pamela)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Continental Casualty Company answer due 3/29/2019; Continental Insurance Company answer due 3/29/2019; National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford answer due 3/29/2019; Valley Forge Insurance Company answer due 3/29/2019. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/11/2019) (mla)
March 8, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Conference re #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Arch Insurance Company's Original Complaint [D.E.#10] by Pamela Dunlop Gates on behalf of Continental Casualty Company, Continental Insurance Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, Valley Forge Insurance Company (Dunlop Gates, Pamela)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Arch Insurance Company's Original Complaint filed by Continental Casualty Company, Continental Insurance Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, Valley Forge Insurance Company Attorney Pamela Dunlop Gates added to party Continental Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela Dunlop Gates added to party Continental Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela Dunlop Gates added to party National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela Dunlop Gates added to party Valley Forge Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Dunlop Gates, Pamela)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arch Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Arch Capital Group Ltd. for Arch Insurance Company. (Brown, Travis)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford; served on 2/19/2019. (zkc)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Valley Forge Insurance Company; served on 2/19/2019. (zkc)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Continental Insurance Company; served on 2/19/2019. (zkc)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Continental Casualty Company; served on 2/19/2019. (zkc)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS Civil Cover Sheet to #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Arch Insurance Company. (Brown, Travis) Modified on 2/19/2019 (zkc).
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Continental Casualty Company, Continental Insurance Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, Valley Forge Insurance Company. (ajb)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ajb)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Arch Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9782838) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Brown, Travis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arch Insurance Company v. National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford
Represented By: Pamela Dunlop Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Forge Insurance Company
Represented By: Pamela Dunlop Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Pamela Dunlop Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Insurance Company
Represented By: Pamela Dunlop Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Travis M Brown
Represented By: Patrick J Wielinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?