Scheurich et al v. Story

Plaintiff: Jennifer Lauren Scheurich, Christina Ashley Zauner and Andrew Page Zauner
Defendant: Tricia Melerine Story
Case Number: 3:2019cv00374
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David L Horan
Referring Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly, this action and all claims of Plaintiffs against Defendant Tricia Melerine Story are dismissed without prejudice. The parties shall bear their own costs. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 3/29/2019) (axm)
March 22, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jennifer Lauren Scheurich, Andrew Page Zauner, Christina Ashley Zauner with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bowen, James) Modified docket text on 3/25/2019 (ajb).
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE: This case is hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge David L. Horan for pretrial management. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 3/22/2019) (svc)
March 8, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tricia Melerine Story. (DiVittorio, Frank)
March 7, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jennifer Lauren Scheurich, Andrew Page Zauner, Christina Ashley Zauner. (Bowen, James)
March 6, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Consideration of Special Appearance previously filed in State Court filed by Tricia Melerine Story (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit(s) A Letters Testamentary, #3 Exhibit(s) B Letters Trusteeship, #4 Declaration(s) Exhibit C identified in memo, #5 Exhibit(s) D vehicle lease) (Miranda, John)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John D. Miranda. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 3/4/2019) (chmb)
February 27, 2019 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jennifer Lauren Scheurich, Andrew Page Zauner, Christina Ashley Zauner. (Bowen, James)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9801362) filed by Tricia Melerine Story (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney John D Miranda added to party Tricia Melerine Story(pty:dft) (Miranda, John)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Letter to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan re: #3 Emergency MOTION to Remand , For Sanctions, and Brief In Support filed by Jennifer Lauren Scheurich, Andrew Page Zauner, Christina Ashley Zauner (Bowen, James)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tricia Melerine Story. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) State Notice of Amended Removal, #2 Exhibit(s) 2-1 P's Additional Appendix, #3 Exhibit(s) 2-2 P's Additional Appendix, #4 Exhibit(s) 2-3 P's Additional Appendix, #5 Exhibit(s) 2-4 P's Additional Appendix, #6 Exhibit(s) 2-5 P's Additional Appendix, #7 Exhibit(s) 2-6 P's Additional Appendix, #8 Exhibit(s) 2-7 P's Additional Appendix) (Bearden, Wes) Modified text on 2/20/2019 (ala).
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REFERENCE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Emergency Motion to Remand, For Sanctions (Doc. #3 ), filed February 15, 2019, is hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge David L. Horan for hearing, if necessary, and for the United States Magistrate Judge to submit to the court proposed findings and recommendations for disposition of the motion. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 2/19/2019) (aaa)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Frank J. DiVittorio. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 2/19/2019) (chmb)
February 18, 2019 Filing 6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9786992) filed by Tricia Melerine Story with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Frank Joseph DiVittorio added to party Tricia Melerine Story(pty:dft) (DiVittorio, Frank)
February 16, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE filed by Tricia Melerine Story re: #3 Emergency MOTION to Remand , For Sanctions, and Brief In Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) TS 1 Merrill Lynch Statements, #2 Exhibit(s) TS 2 Fidelity Statements, #3 Exhibit(s) TS 3 Accounting, #4 Proposed Order Order to Deny, #5 Affidavit(s) Tricia Story Affidavit) (Bearden, Wes)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Appendix in Support filed by Jennifer Lauren Scheurich, Andrew Page Zauner, Christina Ashley Zauner re #3 Emergency MOTION to Remand , For Sanctions, and Brief In Support (Appendix In Support of Emergency Motion To Remand) (Bowen, James)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION to Remand , For Sanctions, and Brief In Support filed by Jennifer Lauren Scheurich, Andrew Page Zauner, Christina Ashley Zauner with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bowen, James)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Probate Court, Dallas County, TX, case number PR-18-03147-1 filed by Tricia Melerine Story. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9783082) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B: Supplemental Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit D: Petition for Removal, #4 Exhibit E: Service of Process, #5 Exhibit F: Special Appearance, #6 Exhibit G: Nonsuit, #7 Exhibit H: Motion/Order to Withdraw, #8 Exhibit I: Notice of Hearing, #9 Exhibit J-1: Amended Petition, #10 Exhibit J-2: Appendix 1, #11 Exhibit J-3: Appendix 2, #12 Exhibit J-4: Appendix 2-1, #13 Exhibit J-4: Appendix 2-1(2), #14 Exhibit J-5: Appendix 2-2, #15 Exhibit K: Filed Discovery, #16 Exhibit L: Zauner Exhibit Index, #17 Exhibit M: State Court Notice, #18 Exhibit N: Petitioner's Memo, #19 Exhibit O: Appendix to Memo, #20 Exhibit C: Docket Sheet) (Bearden, Wes) Modified court information on 2/15/2019 (mla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scheurich et al v. Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Lauren Scheurich
Represented By: Haley Hendrix Anderson
Represented By: Michael C Lee
Represented By: James W Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Ashley Zauner
Represented By: Haley Hendrix Anderson
Represented By: Michael C Lee
Represented By: James W Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Page Zauner
Represented By: Haley Hendrix Anderson
Represented By: Michael C Lee
Represented By: James W Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tricia Melerine Story
Represented By: Wes Bearden
Represented By: Frank Joseph DiVittorio
Represented By: John D Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?