Torres v. QuikTrip Corporation

Plaintiff: Fabiola Torres
Defendant: QuikTrip Corporation d/b/a QuikTrip #974 and QuikTrip Corporation
Undetermined: ADR Provider
Case Number: 3:2019cv00404
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints James J Juneau as mediator. The parties are to complete mediation 90 days before trial. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/4/2019) (ykp)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for JURY trial on the Court's three-week docket beginning 5/11/2020 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Joinder of Parties due by 6/17/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 8/12/2019. Motions due by 12/13/2019. Discovery due by 2/26/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/4/2019) (ykp)
April 4, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Scheduling Conference held on 4/4/2019. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Michael Sutton Clark; Defense - Nicholas Michael Lund. (Court Reporter: Lanie Smith) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :14. (chmb)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT and Discovery Control Plan filed by QuikTrip Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lund, Nicolas)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER: **TIME CHANGE ONLY**FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference is reset for 4/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in the US Courthouse, Courtroom 1632, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/29/2019) (chmb)
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fabiola Torres. (Clark, Michael)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 Designation of lead counsel Nicolas Michael Lund for Defendant QuikTrip Corporation. (Lund, Nicolas)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE SETTING HEARING: ***TIME CHANGE ONLY*** FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference is reset for 4/4/2019 01:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1632, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/7/2019) (chmb)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2019 at 9:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1632, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/6/2019) (aaa)
February 18, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
February 18, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by QuikTrip Corporation. (Briscoe, B)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from County Court at Law No 1, Dallas County, TX, case number CC-19-00469-A filed by QuikTrip Corporation. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9787274) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Exhibit, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Briscoe, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. QuikTrip Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabiola Torres
Represented By: Michael Sutton Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QuikTrip Corporation d/b/a QuikTrip #974
Represented By: Nicolas Michael Lund
Represented By: B Kyle Briscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QuikTrip Corporation
Represented By: Nicolas Michael Lund
Represented By: B Kyle Briscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ADR Provider
Represented By: James J Juneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?