Budri v. FirstFleet Inc et al

Plaintiff: Adriano Kruel Budri
Defendant: David R Beeny, Daniel Matthew Humphreys, FirstFleet Inc and Laurie Brooks
Case Number: 3:2019cv00409
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 18:1030
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re: #38 Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification from the Removal of the Administrative Case and of Which it was Pending Before the Administrative Review Board of United States Department of Labor, Case No. 2018-0055, Case Style: Adriano Budri v. FIRSTFLEET, Inc., Under the (STAA) Surface Transportation Assistance Act. Respondent may file a response by 5/2/2019. Movant may file a reply by 5/16/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 4/16/2019) (mcrd)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: #39 Motion to Strike Defendants' Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions is Denied. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 4/15/2019) (svc)
April 11, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Strike #29 MOTION for Sanctions (Rule 11) and Brief of Law in Support Thereof filed by Adriano Kruel Budri. (epm)
April 11, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Clarification from the Removal of the Administrative Case and of Which it was Pending Before the Administrative Review Board of United States Department of Labor filed by Adriano Kruel Budri. (epm)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re: #36 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions. Because the plaintiff has not demonstrated that the motion to dismiss contains "any redundant, immaterial, impertinent, or scandalous matter", the motion to strike is DENIED. To the extent that the plaintiff intended his motion to strike to also be his response to the motion for sanctions, he must separately file his response by 4/24/2019, as provided by the order of 4/4/2019 (doc. #29 ). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 4/9/2019) (mcrd)
April 8, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Strike #29 MOTION for Sanctions (Rule 11) and Brief of Law in Support Thereof filed by Adriano Kruel Budri. (ndt)
April 4, 2019 Filing 35 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by David R Beeny, Laurie Brooks, FirstFleet Inc, Daniel Matthew Humphreys re #34 Response/Objection (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix in Support, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Proposed Order) (McAllister, Greg)
April 4, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE filed by David R Beeny, Laurie Brooks, FirstFleet Inc, Daniel Matthew Humphreys re: #19 MOTION for Leave to File (McAllister, Greg)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re: #29 Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions. Responses due by 4/24/2019. Replies due by 5/8/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 4/4/2019) (epm)
April 4, 2019 Filing 32 Appendix in Support filed by David R Beeny, Laurie Brooks, FirstFleet Inc, Daniel Matthew Humphreys re #22 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Sixth Amended Complaint and Appendix, #31 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, (McAllister, Greg)
April 4, 2019 Filing 31 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by David R Beeny, Laurie Brooks, FirstFleet Inc, Daniel Matthew Humphreys re #30 Response/Objection, #22 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Sixth Amended Complaint and Appendix (McAllister, Greg)
April 4, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE filed by David R Beeny, Laurie Brooks, FirstFleet Inc, Daniel Matthew Humphreys re: #22 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Sixth Amended Complaint and Appendix (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McAllister, Greg)
April 3, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Sanctions (Rule 11) and Brief of Law in Support Thereof filed by David R Beeny, Laurie Brooks, FirstFleet Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix, #2 Proposed Order) (McAllister, Greg)
April 2, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to David R Beeny ; served on 3/23/2019; Laurie Brooks ; served on 3/23/2019. (ndt)
April 2, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Daniel Matthew Humphreys ; served on 3/7/2019. (ndt)
March 28, 2019 Filing 26 Supplemental Pre Hearing Statement of Position by Adriano Kruel Budri. (mla)
March 25, 2019 Filing 25 Plaintiff's Pre Hearing Statement filed by Adriano Kruel Budri. (ndt)
March 22, 2019 Filing 24 Plaintiff's Pre Hearing Statement of Position filed by Adriano Kruel Budri (ykp)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #20 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 3/20/2019) (mcrd)
March 15, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Sixth Amended Complaint and Appendix filed by Adriano Kruel Budri (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amendment) (ykp)
March 15, 2019 Filing 21 OPPOSITION filed by Adriano Kruel Budri re: #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (ykp)
March 15, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Strike #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Adriano Kruel Budri (ykp) (Main Document 20 replaced on 3/15/2019) (ykp).
March 15, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave and to take Judicial Notice from the Removal of the Administrative Case filed by Adriano Kruel Budri (Attachments: #1 Statement of the Case) (ykp)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of C. Eric Stevens. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 3/13/2019) (Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re: the #15 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof. Respondent may file a response by 4/1/2019. Movant may file a reply by 4/15/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 3/12/2019) (mcrd)
March 12, 2019 Filing 16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9840620) filed by David R Beeny, Laurie Brooks, FirstFleet Inc, Daniel Matthew Humphreys (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)Attorney Charles Eric Stevens added to party David R Beeny(pty:dft), Attorney Charles Eric Stevens added to party Laurie Brooks(pty:dft), Attorney Charles Eric Stevens added to party FirstFleet Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Charles Eric Stevens added to party Daniel Matthew Humphreys(pty:dft) (Stevens, Charles)
March 11, 2019 Filing 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by David R Beeny, Laurie Brooks, FirstFleet Inc, Daniel Matthew Humphreys with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Greg Patrick McAllister added to party David R Beeny(pty:dft), Attorney Greg Patrick McAllister added to party Laurie Brooks(pty:dft), Attorney Greg Patrick McAllister added to party FirstFleet Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Greg Patrick McAllister added to party Daniel Matthew Humphreys(pty:dft) (McAllister, Greg)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Before the Court are four amended complaints filed on 2/27/2019. (See docs. #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 .) The plaintiff may not file any additional amended complaints without seeking leave of court, or obtaining the opposing parties' consent. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 2/28/2019) (mcrd)
February 28, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to David R Beeny, Laurie Brooks, Daniel Matthew Humphreys. (zkc)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to FirstFleet Inc; served on 2/19/2019. (zkc)
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against David R Beeny, Laurie Brooks, FirstFleet Inc, Daniel Matthew Humphreys filed by Adriano Kruel Budri. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (svc)
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against David R Beeny, Laurie Brooks, FirstFleet Inc, Daniel Matthew Humphreys filed by Adriano Kruel Budri. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (svc)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against David R Beeny, Laurie Brooks, FirstFleet Inc, Daniel Matthew Humphreys filed by Adriano Kruel Budri. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (svc)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against David R Beeny, Laurie Brooks, FirstFleet Inc, Daniel Matthew Humphreys filed by Adriano Kruel Budri. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (svc)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against David R Beeny, Laurie Brooks, FirstFleet Inc, Daniel Matthew Humphreys filed by Adriano Kruel Budri. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (svc)
February 20, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Wed Feb 20 12:32:10 CST 2019 (crt)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: On 2/19/2019, the pro se plaintiff filed a complaint against the defendants and paid the full filing fee. Because he paid the fee, the plaintiff is now responsible for serving each defendant with a summons and a copy of the complaint in this case as provided by Rule 4(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of the Court shall send summons forms and a copy of Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 to the plaintiff (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 2/20/2019) (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 FRCP 4) (axm)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to FirstFleet Inc. (ykp)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Appendix in Support filed by Adriano Kruel Budri re: #3 Complaint (ykp)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against David R Beeny, Laurie Brooks, FirstFleet Inc, Daniel Matthew Humphreys filed by Adriano Kruel Budri. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number DS114162) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ykp)
February 19, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Tue Feb 19 17:38:20 CST 2019 (crt)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (ykp)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Budri v. FirstFleet Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriano Kruel Budri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R Beeny
Represented By: Charles Eric Stevens
Represented By: Greg Patrick McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Matthew Humphreys
Represented By: Charles Eric Stevens
Represented By: Greg Patrick McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FirstFleet Inc
Represented By: Charles Eric Stevens
Represented By: Greg Patrick McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Brooks
Represented By: Charles Eric Stevens
Represented By: Greg Patrick McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?