United States of America v. Ajayi et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Smart Ilesanmi Ajayi and JoAnn Villarreal
Case Number: 3:2019cv00476
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/15/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 8/15/2019. Motions due by 4/15/2020. Discovery due by 7/27/2020. Trial set for 8/17/2020 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 4/16/2019) (axm)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/27/2019) (epm)
March 26, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Smart Ilesanmi Ajayi with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Walker, James)
March 26, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Smart Ilesanmi Ajayi. (Walker, James) (Main Document 11 replaced on 3/27/2019) (dss).
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Smart Ilesanmi Ajayi. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney James David Walker added to party Smart Ilesanmi Ajayi(pty:dft) (Walker, James)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 ***SET ASIDE per #13 Order Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Smart Ilesanmi Ajayi, JoAnn Villarreal. (zkc) Modified on 3/27/2019 (epm).
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to issue Clerk's Entry of Default filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4, #6 Clerk's Entry of Default) (Church, Holly)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to JoAnn Villarreal; served on 2/27/2019. (Church, Holly)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Smart Ilesanmi Ajayi; served on 2/27/2019. (Church, Holly)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Smart Ilesanmi Ajayi, JoAnn Villarreal. (rekc)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America. (Church, Holly) (Main Document 3 replaced with flattened image on 2/25/2019) (rekc).
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons to JoAnn Villarreal) (Church, Holly) (Main Document and Attachment 1 replaced on with flattened image on 2/25/2019.) (rekc).
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Smart Ilesanmi Ajayi, Joann Villarreal filed by United States of America. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Church, Holly) (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened image on 2/25/2019) (rekc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Ajayi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smart Ilesanmi Ajayi
Represented By: James David Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JoAnn Villarreal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Holly M Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?