Allen et al v. Northrop Grumman et al

Plaintiff: Scott Meredith, Nicole Henaire, Paxton Allen, David Dunn and Ramon Baney
Defendant: General Dynamics, Northrop Grumman, Raytheon Company and AECOM
Case Number: 3:2019cv00491
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/28/2019) (zkc)
March 28, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Dismissal filed by Paxton Allen, Ramon Baney, David Dunn, Nicole Henaire, Scott Meredith (Magan, Kathryn)
March 25, 2019 Filing 22 Court Request for Recusal: Judge Jane J. Boyle recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Ed Kinkeade for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:19-cv-491-K. (axm)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joshua B. Picker. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/25/2019) (chmb)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric C. Bosset. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/25/2019) (chmb)
March 22, 2019 Filing 19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Joshua B. Picker (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9868866) filed by Northrop Grumman (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Joiner, Jamison)
March 22, 2019 Filing 18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Eric C. Bosset (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9868853) filed by Northrop Grumman (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Joiner, Jamison)
March 22, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Northrop Grumman identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate State Street Bank and Trust Company for Northrop Grumman. (Joiner, Jamison)
March 22, 2019 Filing 16 Appendix in Support filed by Northrop Grumman re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue (Joiner, Jamison)
March 22, 2019 Filing 15 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Northrop Grumman re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue (Joiner, Jamison)
March 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue filed by Northrop Grumman Attorney Jamison Joiner added to party Northrop Grumman(pty:dft) (Joiner, Jamison)
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary J Cruciani for Jennifer L. Truelove and Alexandra F. Easley on behalf of General Dynamics. (Cruciani, Gary)
March 22, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Raytheon Company. (Orwig, Matthew)
March 22, 2019 Filing 11 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Raytheon Company re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Ghorayeb, Basheer)
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Raytheon Company Attorney Basheer Y Ghorayeb added to party Raytheon Company(pty:dft) (Ghorayeb, Basheer)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Defendant General Dynamics' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant General Dynamics must file its answer on or before April 22, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/21/2019) (chmb)
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer of Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by General Dynamics (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Gary J Cruciani added to party General Dynamics(pty:dft) (Cruciani, Gary)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Defendant AECOM's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time. Defendant AECOM must file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before April 19, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/21/2019) (chmb)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Original Complaint filed by AECOM (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting AECOM's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Original Complaint) (Davis, William)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to All Defendants. (Magan, Kathryn)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Paxton Allen, Ramon Baney, David Dunn, Nicole Henaire, Scott Meredith. (Magan, Kathryn)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AECOM, General Dynamics, Northrop Grumman, Raytheon Company.. (zkc)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ramon Baney, Scott Meredith, Paxton Allen, David Dunn, Nicole Henaire. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9807680) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Cover Sheet) (Magan, Kathryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. Northrop Grumman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Meredith
Represented By: Kathryn Magan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Henaire
Represented By: Kathryn Magan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paxton Allen
Represented By: Kathryn Magan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Dunn
Represented By: Kathryn Magan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Baney
Represented By: Kathryn Magan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh Truelove
Represented By: Gary J Cruciani
Represented By: Alexandra Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman
Represented By: Joshua B Picker
Represented By: David T Moran
Represented By: Eric C Bosset
Represented By: Jamison Joiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raytheon Company
Represented By: William Greg Fox, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew D Orwig
Represented By: Basheer Y Ghorayeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM
Represented By: William R Stukenberg
Represented By: Michael J Lombardino
Represented By: William L Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?