Yarbrough v. Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc et al

Plaintiff: Michelle Yarbrough
Defendant: Chipotle Texas LLC, Chipotle Services LLC, Chipotle Texas LP, Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado LLC, Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc, Chipotle Business Group Inc and Chipotle Mexican Grill of Texas LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00524
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/15/2019. Discovery due by 8/18/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 8/15/2019. Motions for Summary Judgment due by 4/15/2020. Jury Trial set for 9/8/2020 09:00 a.m. before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 4/16/2019) (ndt) Modified on 4/17/2019 (zkc).
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion For Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/18/2019) (ndt)
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION For Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Reilley, Steven) Modified on 3/13/2019 to enhance text(dss).
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Texas LLC, Chipotle Texas, L.P., Chipotle Services LLC, Chipotle Mexican Grill of Texas, LLC, Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Chipotle Texas LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Chipotle Services LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Pershing Square Holdings Ltd, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Chipotle Mexican Grill Texas Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate CMGGC LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado LLC for Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc. (Reilley, Steven) Modified to add filers on 3/6/2019 (zkc).
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Reilley, Steven)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ajb)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 160th Judicial District, Dallas County, case number DC-19-01352 filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Texas LLC, Chipotle Texas, L.P., Chipotle Services LLC, Chipotle Mexican Grill of Texas, LLC, Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9817583) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Reilley, Steven) (Attachment 5 replaced with flattened image on 3/1/2019) (ajb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yarbrough v. Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chipotle Texas LLC
Represented By: Peter Thompson
Represented By: Steven Scott Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chipotle Services LLC
Represented By: Peter Thompson
Represented By: Steven Scott Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chipotle Texas LP
Represented By: Peter Thompson
Represented By: Steven Scott Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado LLC
Represented By: Peter Thompson
Represented By: Steven Scott Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc
Represented By: Peter Thompson
Represented By: Steven Scott Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chipotle Business Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chipotle Mexican Grill of Texas LLC
Represented By: Peter Thompson
Represented By: Steven Scott Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Yarbrough
Represented By: Kristina N Kastl
Represented By: Heather Victoria Banahan Nease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?