Garcia v. Direct Energy LP

Plaintiff: Arnold Garcia
Defendant: Direct Energy LP
Case Number: 3:2019cv00531
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Arnold Garcia (Agruss, Michael)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise Respond re: #1 Complaint. Direct Energy LP answer due 5/21/2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/29/2019) (zkc)
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Direct Energy LP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond) (Varshosaz, Artoush)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Direct Energy LP answer due 4/30/2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/9/2019) (axm)
April 9, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Direct Energy LP. (Varshosaz, Artoush)
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time answer Complaint filed by Direct Energy LP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Artoush Varshosaz added to party Direct Energy LP(pty:dft) (Varshosaz, Artoush)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Direct Energy LP ; served on 3/19/2019. (Agruss, Michael)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Direct Energy LP. (axm)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dena L Mathis for Michael S. Agruss on behalf of Arnold Garcia. (Mathis, Dena)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arnold Garcia. (Agruss, Michael)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Arnold Garcia. (Agruss, Michael)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Direct Energy, LP filed by Arnold Garcia. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9820713) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Agruss, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Direct Energy LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Garcia
Represented By: Dena L Mathis
Represented By: Michael S. Agruss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct Energy LP
Represented By: Artoush Varshosaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?