USA v. Mun et al

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Su Y Amos Mun, One Way Investments Inc, Micha Mun and Amos Mun
Case Number: 3:2019cv00533
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Micha Mun ; served on 3/7/2019; Su Y Amos Mun ; served on 3/7/2019; One Way Investments Inc ; served on 3/7/2019. (svc)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Micha Mun, Su Y Amos Mun, One Way Investments Inc. (ykp)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to File to File Documents Under Seal. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/6/2019) (ewd)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David C Godbey for all further proceedings. Senior Judge A. Joe Fish no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 3/5/2019) (epm)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge A. Joe Fish for all further proceedings. Judge Jane J. Boyle no longer assigned to case due to recusal. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/5/2019) (epm)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by USA. (epm)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Su Y Amos Mun, Micha Mun, One Way Investments Inc filed by USA. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (epm) Modified on 3/6/2019 (zkc).
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File for Leave to File Documents Under Seal filed by USA. (epm)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Mun et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Su Y Amos Mun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Way Investments Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micha Mun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amos Mun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Lindsey E Beran-DOJ
Represented By: J Scott Hogan-DOJ
Represented By: Braden Civins-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?