Braun v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al

Plaintiff: J Kevin Braun
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services Inc, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy International Limited, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International and DePuy Inc
Special Master: Special Master
Case Number: 3:2019cv00544
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Pers Inj/Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. Waiver sent on 2/19/2019. (Matarazzo, Hadley)
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Johnson & Johnson International. Waiver sent on 2/19/2019. (Matarazzo, Hadley)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Johnson & Johnson. Waiver sent on 2/19/2019. (Matarazzo, Hadley)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to DePuy Inc. Waiver sent on 2/19/2019. (Matarazzo, Hadley)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. Waiver sent on 2/19/2019. (Matarazzo, Hadley)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 Case electronically transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 6:19-cv-06124. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
March 5, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Texas. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 3/6/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 3/6/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Multidistrict Litigation Panel notified of potential case. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 3/6/2019.]
February 19, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 3/6/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 3/6/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 3/6/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 3/6/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3364752, filed by J. Kevin Braun. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Rider for Summons)(Matarazzo, Hadley) [Transferred from New York Western on 3/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braun v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy International Limited
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson International
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Special Master
Represented By: James M Stanton-2244
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J Kevin Braun
Represented By: Hadley L Matarazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?