Simmons v. John Doe 1 et al

Plaintiff: Jason Simmons
Defendant: John Doe #4, Mr John Doe's, John Doe #1, John Doe #3, John Doe #2 and Texas Medical Board Executive Committee
Case Number: 3:2019cv00678
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (ndt)
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 Case electronically transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-01275. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TRANSFER ORDER: Accordingly, the Court directs the Clerk of Court to transfer this action to the Northern District of Texas. The Court offers no opinion on the merits of this action and declines to decide Plaintiff's pending IFP #2 application, which is reserved for the transferee court. The Court waives the provision of Local Rule 83.1, which requires a seven-day stay. No summons shall issue from this Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED by Judge Margo K. Brodie, on 3/14/2019. C/mailed w/Attachments: #1 Appendix I, #2 Appendix II, #3 Appendix III, #4 Appendix IV. Case transferred electronically to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas via CM/ECF Extract Civil Case. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/19/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/19/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 Supplemental COMPLAINT , filed by Jason Simmons. (Piper, Francine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/19/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Se Consent to Electronic Notification by Jason Simmons (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/19/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jason Simmons. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/19/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jason Simmons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. John Doe 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr John Doe's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Medical Board Executive Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?