VeroBlue Farms USA Inc v. Wulf et al
Plaintiff: VeroBlue Farms USA Inc
Defendant: Keith Driver
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Bruce A Hall, John E Rea, James Rea and Leslie A Wulf
Interested Party: SNB Farms Partnership, Jeff Nelson, Mark Nelson, Korrine Nelson, Grace Nelson and Jerita Nelson
3Rd Party Defendant: Dr Otto Happel, Jens Haarkoetter, Eva Ebstein, Bjorn Thelander, Anders Wester, Alder Aqua Ltd and Norman McCowan
Case Number: 3:2019cv00764
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Referring Judge: Brantley Starr
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ELECTRONIC ORDER GRANTING #102 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The requesting party must file the Second Amended Complaint on or before September 23, 2019. After the Second Amended Complaint is filed, the Court will be dismissing as moot Third-Party Defendant Alder Aqua Ltds 157 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 66 Answer to Amended Complaint. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 9/20/2019) (chmb)
September 18, 2019 Filing 157 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Alder Aqua Ltd re: #66 Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Katharine Battaia Clark added to party Alder Aqua Ltd(pty:3pd) (Clark, Katharine) Modified text on 9/21/2019 (axm).
September 18, 2019 Filing 156 AFFIDAVIT of Service Upon Third Party Defendant Alder Aqua, Ltd. by Leslie A Wulf. (Buether, Blake)
September 17, 2019 Filing 155 RESPONSE filed by Bruce A Hall, James Rea, John E Rea, Leslie A Wulf re: #145 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Pierce, Elisha)
September 16, 2019 Filing 154 Return of Service for Subpoena served on Suzanne L Pariser, Employment Matters LLC, Flynn Investigations Group on 9/4/2019. (axm)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #135 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM DEFENDANTS. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 9/10/2019) (mcrd)
September 6, 2019 Filing 152 REPLY filed by VeroBlue Farms USA Inc re: #135 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Williams, Nicole)
September 4, 2019 Filing 151 Proof of Service for a Subpoena served on Broadmoor Financial L.P. c/o Roy Baker on 8/19/2019. (ykp)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Special Order 3-333: Effective September 3, 2019, the cases listed on Exhibit A to this order are transferred to Judge Brantley Starr's docket and shall henceforth be designated by the suffix letter X. (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/27/2019) (cea)
September 3, 2019 Filing 149 RESPONSE filed by Norman McCowan re: #114 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Claims Pursuant to the TCPA (Williams, Nicole)
August 30, 2019 Filing 148 Appendix in Support filed by Leslie A Wulf re #147 Response/Objection (Buether, Blake)
August 30, 2019 Filing 147 RESPONSE filed by Leslie A Wulf re: #135 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Buether, Blake)
August 29, 2019 Filing 146 Proof of Service of Subpoena on Davis Graham & Stubbs LLP; served 8/20/2019. (ndt)
August 27, 2019 Filing 145 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction () filed by Bjorn Thelander with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 4)Attorney Nicole Leigh Williams added to party Bjorn Thelander(pty:3pd) (Williams, Nicole)
August 27, 2019 Filing 144 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena served on Amstar Group on 8/20/2019. (epm)
August 27, 2019 Filing 143 RESPONSE filed by Bruce A Hall, James Rea, John E Rea, Leslie A Wulf re: #114 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Claims Pursuant to the TCPA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - Klocke v. Watson Opinion) (Pierce, Elisha)
August 22, 2019 Filing 142 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Settlement filed by Bruce A Hall, Norman McCowan, James Rea, John E Rea, VeroBlue Farms USA Inc, Leslie A Wulf. (Wynton, Jasmine)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #37 Motion to Quash Subpoenas or for Protective Order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 8/20/2019) (mcrd)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Any response to Plaintiff VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery #135 by August 30, 2019, and any reply must be filed by September 6, 2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 8/19/2019.)
August 19, 2019 Filing 139 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bjorn Thelander (Pierce, Elisha)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Order Referring #135 MOTION to Compel Discovery to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 8/19/2019) (rekc)
August 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #47 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant Wulf, Hall, J. Rea, and T. Rea's Reply Brief. This Court's local rules do not prohibit or discourage reply briefs, but motions to strike and unauthorized or disguised sur-replies are disfavored. And motions to strike under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(f) are limited to pleadings, and a reply in support of a discovery motion is not a pleading. The Court will consider the reply #46 in resolving #37 Defendants' Motion to Quash Subpoenas or for Protective Order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 8/17/2019.)
August 16, 2019 Filing 136 Appendix in Support filed by VeroBlue Farms USA Inc re #135 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Williams, Nicole)
August 16, 2019 Filing 135 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by VeroBlue Farms USA Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williams, Nicole)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER OF REFERENCE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Defendant's Motion to Quash Subpoenas or for Protective Order (Doc. #37 ), and Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant Wulf, Hall, J. Rea, and T. Reas Reply Brief (Doc. #47 ) are hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge David L. Horan for hearing, if necessary, and determination. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 8/1/2019) (ykp)
July 19, 2019 Filing 133 REPLY filed by Norman McCowan re: #113 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Wynton, Jasmine)
July 19, 2019 Filing 132 REPLY filed by Norman McCowan re: #114 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Claims Pursuant to the TCPA (Wynton, Jasmine)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #129 Motion to Extend Time. Accordingly, the deadline for Third-Party Defendant Norman McCowan to reply to the Responses is 7/19/2019. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 7/16/2019) (chmb)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #125 Motion. Accordingly, Plaintiff may exceed the page limit on its reply by no more than five (5) pages. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 7/16/2019) (chmb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 129 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time two-day extension filed by Norman McCowan (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amendment) (Williams, Nicole)
July 3, 2019 Filing 128 REPLY filed by VeroBlue Farms USA Inc re: #102 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Williams, Nicole)
July 3, 2019 Filing 127 RESPONSE filed by Keith Driver, Bruce A Hall, James Rea, John E Rea, Leslie A Wulf re: #114 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Claims Pursuant to the TCPA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - Text of Revised TX HB2730) (Pierce, Elisha)
July 3, 2019 Filing 126 RESPONSE filed by Keith Driver, Bruce A Hall, James Rea, John E Rea, Leslie A Wulf re: #113 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Pierce, Elisha)
July 1, 2019 Filing 125 MOTION for leave to exceed page limit in reply in support of #102 Motion for Leave to Amend Amended Complaint filed by VeroBlue Farms USA Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wynton, Jasmine)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #123 Motion to Extend Time to File Reply. Accordingly, the deadline for Plaintiff to file replies to Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint is 7/3/2019. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/25/2019) (chmb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 123 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #122 Response/Objection, #117 Response/Objection filed by VeroBlue Farms USA Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williams, Nicole)
June 14, 2019 Filing 122 RESPONSE filed by James Rea re: #102 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s)) (Annello, Kimberly)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MEDIATION ORDER. The parties are to select or designate a mediator. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 5/1/2020. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/14/2019) (zkc)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this court's four-week docket beginning 10/5/2020 before Judge Sam A Lindsay. Joinder of Parties due by 10/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2019. Motions due by 5/15/2020. Discovery due by 5/1/2020. Pretrial Order due by 9/8/2020. Pretrial Materials due by 9/8/2020. Settlement Status Report due by 8/22/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Sam A Lindsay. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/14/2019) (zkc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 119 REPLY filed by Keith Driver re: #67 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Beaird, Katherine)
June 13, 2019 Filing 118 Appendix in Support filed by Keith Driver re #117 Response/Objection (Response to VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Its Amended Complaint and Brief in Support) (Beaird, Katherine)
June 13, 2019 Filing 117 RESPONSE filed by Keith Driver re: #102 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Beaird, Katherine)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #115 Motion to Extend Time. Accordingly, the deadline for the Founder Defendants to file responses to both of Third-Party Defendant McCowan's Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 113 and 114) is 7/3/2019. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/13/2019) (chmb)
June 12, 2019 Filing 115 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #114 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Claims Pursuant to the TCPA, #113 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by James Rea (Annello, Kimberly)
June 1, 2019 Filing 114 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Claims Pursuant to the TCPA filed by Norman McCowan with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 5)Attorney Nicole Leigh Williams added to party Norman McCowan(pty:3pd) (Williams, Nicole)
May 31, 2019 Filing 113 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Norman McCowan with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5)Attorney Jasmine Selia Wynton added to party Norman McCowan(pty:3pd) (Wynton, Jasmine)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/31/2019) (ykp)
May 30, 2019 Filing 111 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by VeroBlue Farms USA Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wynton, Jasmine)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #109 Motion to Extend Time to File Response. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendants Leslie A. Wulf, Bruce A. Hall, James Rea, and John E. "Ted" Rea to file their response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend its Amended Petition is 6/14/2019. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/29/2019) (chmb)
May 28, 2019 Filing 109 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #102 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by John E Rea (Annello, Kimberly)
May 23, 2019 Filing 108 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by VeroBlue Farms USA Inc. (Wynton, Jasmine)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #106 Motion to Extend Time to File. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendant to file a reply in support of his Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to dismiss and Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave is 6/14/2019. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/22/2019) (chmb)
May 17, 2019 Filing 106 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #67 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #102 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Keith Driver (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Grnating Agreed Motion to Extend deadline to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave and Reply in Support of Keith Driver's Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss) (Beaird, Katherine)
May 16, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine Rose Beaird on behalf of Keith Driver. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Beaird, Katherine)
May 15, 2019 Filing 104 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS, Corrected Exhibit 22 ( #102 -4), to #102 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. (Wynton, Jasmine) Modified text on 5/16/2019 (mla).
May 13, 2019 Filing 103 RESPONSE filed by VeroBlue Farms USA Inc re: #67 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Wynton, Jasmine)
May 13, 2019 Filing 102 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by VeroBlue Farms USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibits 1 to 8 to Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibits 9 to 21 to Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibits 22-1 to 22-15 to Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibits 23 to 27 to Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibits 28 to 40 to Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibits 41 to 44 to Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit B - Redline of Proposed Second Amended Complaint Against Amended Complaint, #9 Proposed Order Granting Leave to Amend The Amended Complaint) (Wynton, Jasmine)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #100 Motion to Extend Time. Accordingly, the deadline for Plaintiff Veroblue Farms USA, Inc. to respond to Defendant Keith Driver's Motion to Dismiss is 5/13/2019. The court will allow no further extensions of this deadline. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/9/2019) (chmb)
May 7, 2019 Filing 100 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time for Plaintiff VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc.'s Deadline to Respond to #67 Defendant Keith Driver's Motion to Dismiss filed by VeroBlue Farms USA Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wynton, Jasmine)
May 3, 2019 Filing 99 Summons Issued as to Eva Ebstein, Jens Haarkoetter, Otto Happel, Norman McCowan, Bjorn Thelander, Anders Wester. (zkc)
May 3, 2019 Filing 98 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Bruce A Hall, James Rea, John E Rea, Leslie A Wulf. (Annello, Kimberly)
May 3, 2019 Filing 97 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Bruce A Hall, James Rea, John E Rea, Leslie A Wulf. (Annello, Kimberly)
May 3, 2019 Filing 96 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Bruce A Hall, James Rea, John E Rea, Leslie A Wulf. (Annello, Kimberly)
May 3, 2019 Filing 95 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Bruce A Hall, James Rea, John E Rea, Leslie A Wulf. (Annello, Kimberly)
May 3, 2019 Filing 94 Summons Issued as to Alder Aqua Ltd. (zkc)
May 3, 2019 Filing 93 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Bruce A Hall, James Rea, John E Rea, Leslie A Wulf. (Annello, Kimberly)
May 3, 2019 Filing 92 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Bruce A Hall, James Rea, John E Rea, Leslie A Wulf. (Annello, Kimberly)
May 3, 2019 Filing 91 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Bruce A Hall, James Rea, John E Rea, Leslie A Wulf. (Annello, Kimberly)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ELECTRONIC ORDER terminating as moot #75 Non-Parties SNB Farm Partnership, Grace Nelson, Jeff Nelson, Jerita Nelson, Korinne Nelson, and Mark Nelson's Motion to Sever and Transfer Their Motion to Quash Subpoenas to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Iowa in light of the Court's #89 April 29, 2019 Order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 4/30/2019.)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #86 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Their Motion to Quash Subpoenas or, In the Alternative, Motion for Protective Order Without Prejudice. The court directs the clerk of court to withdraw the #41 Motion to Quash Subpoenas, or, In the Alternative, for Protective Order. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/29/2019) (aaa)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #87 Motion to Extend Time to File Response. Accordingly, the deadline for Plaintiff to Respond to Keith Driver's Motion to Dismiss is 5/8/2019. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/29/2019) (chmb)
April 26, 2019 Filing 87 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #67 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by VeroBlue Farms USA Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wynton, Jasmine)
April 26, 2019 Filing 86 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #41 filed by Grace Nelson, Jeff Nelson, Jerita Nelson, Korrine Nelson, Mark Nelson, SNB Farms Partnership (Sigwarth, Karl)
April 25, 2019 Filing 85 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by VeroBlue Farms USA Inc. (Wynton, Jasmine)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDERS VACATING AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER AND ISSUING STATUS REPORT ORDER Status Report due by 5/23/2019. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/23/2019) (rekc)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Order Referring #75 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Their Motion to Quash Subpoenas to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Iowa. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/23/2019) (rekc)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #65 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Patrick Morales-Doyle. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/22/2019) (chmb)
April 22, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William L Banowsky on behalf of VeroBlue Farms USA Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Banowsky, William)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #78 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Accordingly, the court allows Laura Michelle Hyer, Joseph E. Schmall, and the law firm of Bradley & Riley PC to withdraw as counsel for Non-Parties SNB Farm Partnership, Grace Nelson, Jeff Nelson, Jerita Nelson, Korinne Nelson, and Mark Nelson (collectively "SNB Non-Parties"), and they are relieved of any further obligation to or representation of SNB Non-Parties in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/22/2019) (chmb)
April 18, 2019 Filing 79 EXPEDITED Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #36 Order, Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions, filed by VeroBlue Farms USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wynton, Jasmine) Modified on 4/19/2019 to enhance text (dss).
April 17, 2019 Filing 78 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Grace Nelson, Jeff Nelson, Jerita Nelson, Korrine Nelson, Mark Nelson, SNB Farms Partnership (Sigwarth, Karl)
April 17, 2019 Filing 77 Appendix in Support filed by Grace Nelson, Jeff Nelson, Jerita Nelson, Korrine Nelson, Mark Nelson, SNB Farms Partnership re #75 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Sigwarth, Karl)
April 17, 2019 Filing 76 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Grace Nelson, Jeff Nelson, Jerita Nelson, Korrine Nelson, Mark Nelson, SNB Farms Partnership re #75 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Sigwarth, Karl)
April 17, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by Grace Nelson, Jeff Nelson, Jerita Nelson, Korrine Nelson, Mark Nelson, SNB Farms Partnership (Sigwarth, Karl)
April 17, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Karl Sigwarth on behalf of Grace Nelson, Jeff Nelson, Jerita Nelson, Korrine Nelson, Mark Nelson, SNB Farms Partnership. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Sigwarth, Karl)
April 12, 2019 Filing 73 RESPONSE filed by Bruce A Hall, James Rea, John E Rea, Leslie A Wulf re: #47 MOTION to Strike. (Annello, Kimberly)
April 12, 2019 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bruce A Hall, James Rea, John E Rea, Leslie A Wulf. (Annello, Kimberly)
April 10, 2019 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Keith Driver. (Cheek, R)
April 10, 2019 Filing 70 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint filed by Keith Driver. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Cheek, R)
April 10, 2019 Filing 69 Appendix in Support filed by Keith Driver re #68 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Cheek, R)
April 10, 2019 Filing 68 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Keith Driver re #67 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Cheek, R)
April 10, 2019 Filing 67 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Keith Driver (Cheek, R)
April 10, 2019 Filing 66 Defendants' ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint filed by Bruce A Hall, John E Rea, James Rea, Leslie A Wulf. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Eva Ebstein, Jens Haarkoetter, Bjorn Thelander, Anders Wester, Norman McCowan, Otto Happel, Alder Aqua Ltd. filed by Bruce A Hall, John E Rea, James Rea, Leslie A Wulf. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits A-E to Answer) (Annello, Kimberly)
April 10, 2019 Filing 65 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9909769) filed by VeroBlue Farms USA Inc Attorney Patrick Morales-Doyle added to party VeroBlue Farms USA Inc(pty:pla) (Morales-Doyle, Patrick)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #53 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Accordingly, attorneys Joseph Foster Moser; Stacie M Codr and Megan Kennedy Marty are withdrawn as counsel for Defendants and they are relieved of any further obligation to or representation of Defendants in this action. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/9/2019) (chmb)
April 9, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jasmine Selia Wynton on behalf of VeroBlue Farms USA Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Wynton, Jasmine)
April 9, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicole Leigh Williams on behalf of VeroBlue Farms USA Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Williams, Nicole)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #57 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adam C. Decker. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/9/2019) (chmb)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #56 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eileen Boyle Perich. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/9/2019) (chmb)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #55 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Caroline Pritikin. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/9/2019) (chmb)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #54 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert H. Lang. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/9/2019) (chmb)
April 8, 2019 Filing 57 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Adam C. Decker (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9904723) filed by VeroBlue Farms USA Inc Attorney Adam Casey Decker added to party VeroBlue Farms USA Inc(pty:pla) (Decker, Adam)
April 8, 2019 Filing 56 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Eileen E. Boyle Perich (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9904715) filed by VeroBlue Farms USA Inc (Boyle Perich, Eileen)
April 8, 2019 Filing 55 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Caroline Pritikin (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9904712) filed by VeroBlue Farms USA Inc (Pritikin, Caroline)
April 8, 2019 Filing 54 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Robert H Lang (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9904704) filed by VeroBlue Farms USA Inc (Lang, Robert)
April 1, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Keith Driver, Bruce A Hall, James Rea, John E Rea, Leslie A Wulf Attorney Kimberly DeShano Annello added to party Keith Driver(pty:dft) (Annello, Kimberly)
March 27, 2019 Filing 52 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
March 27, 2019 Filing 51 Case electronically transferred in from District of Iowa Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-03047. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #19 Motion to dismiss for improper venue or Motion to transfer venue. It is denied as to the motion to dismiss and is granted as to the motion to transfer venue. Granting in part and denying in part #20 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim and motion to transfer venue. It is granted as to the motion to transfer venue. This court takes no position on #20 motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, which is reserved for adjudication by the transferee court. The Clerk shall transfer this entire case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 3/27/2019. (Case electronically transferred to Northern District of Texas) (des) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 49 REPLY BRIEF re #41 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas, or, in the alternative, for Protective Order filed by Grace Nelson, Jeff Nelson, Jerita Nelson, Korrine Nelson, Mark Nelson, SNB Farms Partnership. (Caves, David) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 48 BRIEF in Support re #47 MOTION to Strike #46 Response to Motion re #37 to Quash Subpoenas or for Protective Order filed by VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc. (Lang, Robert) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (skm). [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION to Strike #46 Response to Motion re #37 Motion to Quash Subpoenas or for Protective Order by Plaintiff VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc. Responses due by 4/5/2019 (Lang, Robert) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (skm). [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 46 REPLY to #42 Response to Motion re #37 MOTION to Quash filed by Bruce A Hall, James Rea, John E Rea, Leslie A Wulf. (DeShano Annello, Kimberly) Modified text on 3/18/2019 (jjh). Modified to correct link on 3/19/2019 (skm). [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 45 SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM to #44 Resistance to #41 Motion to Quash by VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc (Lang, Robert) Modified text to add link on 3/19/2019 (skm). [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 44 RESISTANCE to Motion re #41 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas, or, in the alternative, for Protective Order filed by VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F) (Lang, Robert) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kimberly Marie DeShano Annello (DeShano Annello, Kimberly) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 42 Response to Motion re #37 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas or for Protective Order filed by VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F) (Lang, Robert) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Set Deadline: Interested Party SNB Farms Partnership LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 3/31/2019. (skm) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas, or, in the alternative, for Protective Order by Movants Grace Nelson, Jeff Nelson, Jerita Nelson, Korrine Nelson, Mark Nelson, SNB Farms Partnership (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Nonparties' Motion to Quash Subpoenas, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5) (Caves, David) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Michelle Hyer on behalf of Grace Nelson, Jeff Nelson, Jerita Nelson, Korrine Nelson, Mark Nelson, SNB Farms Partnership. (Hyer, Laura) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Caves on behalf of Grace Nelson, Jeff Nelson, Jerita Nelson, Korrine Nelson, Mark Nelson, SNB Farms Partnership. (Caves, David) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E Schmall on behalf of Grace Nelson, Mark Nelson, Jeff Nelson, Jerita Nelson, Korrine Nelson, SNB Farms Partnership. (Schmall, Joseph) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
February 24, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas or for Protective Order by Defendants Bruce A Hall, James Rea, John E Rea, Leslie A Wulf (Attachments: #1 Brief in Supp of Motion to Quash, #2 Exhibit GM Subpoena, #3 Exhibit HMB Subpoena, #4 Exhibit Beecher Firm Subpoena, #5 Exhibit Fish Dish Subpoena, #6 Exhibit Turk Subpoena, #7 Exhibit Lockard Subpoena, #8 Exhibit Bank Subpoena, #9 Exhibit Creditors Challenge 12 19 18, #10 Exhibit Equity Challenge 12 20 18, #11 Exhibit Counsel Email 2 22 19, #12 Exhibit Fee Petition Excerpt) (DeShano Annello, Kimberly) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan filed by VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc. Add Parties Deadline due by 4/23/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 4/23/2019. Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses due by 5/23/2019. Defendants' Expert Witnesses due by 6/21/2019. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Experts due by 7/22/2019. Discovery due by 10/20/2019. Motions due by 11/20/2019. Trial Ready Deadline 6/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 12/18/2018. (skm) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Plaintiff VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Lang, Robert) Modified text on 12/17/2018 (skm). [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AMENDED TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Jury Trial reset for 6/22/2020 9:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (3rd Floor) Sioux City before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 6/9/2020 3:00 PM in Ctrm 3 (3rd Floor) Sioux City before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/6/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 11/26/2018. (src) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Jury Trial set for 3/30/2020 9:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (3rd Floor) Sioux City before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2020 3:00 PM in Ctrm 3 (3rd Floor) Sioux City before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/14/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 11/16/2018. (src) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 11/28/2018 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 12/29/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 12/29/2018. Plaintiffs Expert Witnesses due by 1/29/2019. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 3/29/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 4/29/2019. Discovery due by 6/28/2019. Motions due by 7/31/2019. Trial Ready Deadline 12/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 11/15/2018. (skm) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 31 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Telephonic Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Scheduling Conference held on 11/14/2018 (Court Reporter FTR Gold). (skm) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Bruce A Hall, James Rea, John E Rea, Leslie A Wulf. (Codr, Stacie) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Keith Driver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Codr, Stacie) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Setting Hearing: A telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 11/14/2018 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts (see text of Order for instructions). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 11/5/2018. (skm) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying as moot #21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Stay Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 11/1/18. (dmc) Modified on 11/2/2018 (skm). [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Norman McCowan re #24 Resistance to #20 Motion to Dismiss by VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1) (Lang, Robert) Modified text to add links on 10/31/2018 (skm). [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 25 RESISTANCE to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Motion to Transfer Venue and Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery filed by VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Pritikin, Caroline) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 24 RESISTANCE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Motion to Transfer Venue and Alternative Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery filed by VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Lang, Robert) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. No conflicts identified. (des) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kimberly Marie DeShano Annello on behalf of Bruce A Hall, James Rea, John E Rea, and Leslie A Wulf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 10/22/2018 (conflicts checked; none found). (skm) Modified text on 10/22/2018 (des) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney R. Heath Cheek on behalf of Keith Driver. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 10/22/2018 (conflicts checked; none found). (skm) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Stay Joint Scheduling Report by Plaintiff VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Pritikin, Caroline) Modified text on 10/18/2018 (skm). [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Motion to Transfer Venue by Defendant Keith Driver. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Appendix) (Codr, Stacie) Modified text on 10/16/2018 (skm). [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Motion to Transfer Venue by Defendants Bruce A Hall, James Rea, John E Rea, Leslie A Wulf. Responses due by 10/29/2018. Check Status on MJ Consent due by 10/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibits A, A1-A2, #3 Exhibits B, B-1, #4 Exhibits C, C1-C2, #5 Exhibits D, D1-D2, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibits F1-F3) (Codr, Stacie) Modified text on 10/16/2018 (skm). [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kimberly Marie DeShano Annello ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2793860) by Defendants Bruce A Hall, James Rea, John E Rea, Leslie A Wulf (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Codr, Stacie) Modified text on 10/22/2018 (des) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney R. Heath Cheek ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2793835) by Defendant Keith Driver (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Codr, Stacie) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacie M Codr, Megan Kennedy Marty, and Joseph F. Moser on behalf of All Defendants. (Codr, Stacie) Modified text on 10/16/2018 (skm). [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Magistrate Judge CJ Williams no longer assigned to the case: No conflicts identified (kfs) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc. Keith Driver waiver sent on 8/20/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Logan, Holly) Modified text to correct dates on 8/22/2018 (skm). [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc. Leslie A Wulf waiver sent on 8/17/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Logan, Holly) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc. John E Rea waiver sent on 8/17/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Logan, Holly) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc. James Rea waiver sent on 8/17/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Logan, Holly) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc. Bruce A Hall waiver sent on 8/17/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Logan, Holly) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 10 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc (Lang, Robert) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED Complaint With Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Logan, Holly) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert H. Lang, #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Caroline Pritikin, #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eileen E. Boyle Perich, and #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Renato Mariotti on behalf of VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 8/9/2018 (conflicts checked; none found). (skm) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Renato Mariotti ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-2750185) by Plaintiff VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Logan, Holly) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eileen E. Boyle Perich ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-2750184) by Plaintiff VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Logan, Holly) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Caroline Pritikin ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-2750176) by Plaintiff VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Logan, Holly) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert H. Lang ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-2750169) by Plaintiff VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate) (Logan, Holly) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Keith Driver, Bruce A. Hall, James Rea, John E. Rea, Leslie A. Wulf. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Case Packet) (jjh) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline 8/31/2018. (jjh) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Keith Driver, Bruce A. Hall, James Rea, John E. Rea, Leslie A. Wulf (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0862-2744849) filed by VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc. Scheduling Report due by 10/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/1/2018 to add case#) (jjh). [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 3/28/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VeroBlue Farms USA Inc v. Wulf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VeroBlue Farms USA Inc
Represented By: Katelyn T McCollough
Represented By: Holly M Logan
Represented By: Matthew E Laughlin
Represented By: Robert H Lang
Represented By: Caroline Pritikin
Represented By: Renato Mariotti
Represented By: Eileen E Boyle Perich
Represented By: Eileen Boyle Perich
Represented By: Jasmine Selia Wynton
Represented By: Nicole Leigh Williams
Represented By: Adam Casey Decker
Represented By: Patrick Morales-Doyle
Represented By: William L Banowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Bruce A Hall
Represented By: Megan Kennedy Marty
Represented By: Joseph Foster Moser
Represented By: Stacie M Codr
Represented By: Kimberly DeShano Annello
Represented By: Elisha Davis Pierce
Represented By: David L Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: John E Rea
Represented By: Megan Kennedy Marty
Represented By: Joseph Foster Moser
Represented By: Stacie M Codr
Represented By: Kimberly DeShano Annello
Represented By: Elisha Davis Pierce
Represented By: David L Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: James Rea
Represented By: Megan Kennedy Marty
Represented By: Joseph Foster Moser
Represented By: Stacie M Codr
Represented By: Kimberly DeShano Annello
Represented By: Elisha Davis Pierce
Represented By: David L Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Leslie A Wulf
Represented By: Megan Kennedy Marty
Represented By: Joseph Foster Moser
Represented By: Stacie M Codr
Represented By: Kimberly DeShano Annello
Represented By: Elisha Davis Pierce
Represented By: David L Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SNB Farms Partnership
Represented By: Laura Michelle Hyer
Represented By: Joseph E Schmall
Represented By: David Michael Caves
Represented By: Karl Sigwarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jeff Nelson
Represented By: Laura Michelle Hyer
Represented By: Joseph E Schmall
Represented By: David Michael Caves
Represented By: Karl Sigwarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Mark Nelson
Represented By: Laura Michelle Hyer
Represented By: Joseph E Schmall
Represented By: David Michael Caves
Represented By: Karl Sigwarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Korrine Nelson
Represented By: Laura Michelle Hyer
Represented By: Joseph E Schmall
Represented By: David Michael Caves
Represented By: Karl Sigwarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Grace Nelson
Represented By: Laura Michelle Hyer
Represented By: Joseph E Schmall
Represented By: David Michael Caves
Represented By: Karl Sigwarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jerita Nelson
Represented By: Laura Michelle Hyer
Represented By: Joseph E Schmall
Represented By: David Michael Caves
Represented By: Karl Sigwarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Driver
Represented By: Megan Kennedy Marty
Represented By: Joseph Foster Moser
Represented By: R Heath Cheek
Represented By: Stacie M Codr
Represented By: Kimberly DeShano Annello
Represented By: Katherine Rose Beaird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Dr Otto Happel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Jens Haarkoetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Eva Ebstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Bjorn Thelander
Represented By: Nicole Leigh Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Anders Wester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Alder Aqua Ltd
Represented By: Joel Bailey
Represented By: Katharine Battaia Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Norman McCowan
Represented By: Jasmine Selia Wynton
Represented By: Nicole Leigh Williams
Represented By: William L Banowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?