Thoms v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al

Plaintiff: Donna L Thoms
Defendant: DePuy Products Inc, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc, Depuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy International Limited and Johnson & Johnson Inc
Special Master: Special Master
Case Number: 3:2019cv00773
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Pers Inj/Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 Case electronically transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-02421. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 313) by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In re: MDL 2244 DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Pinnacle Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. Case transferred to the Northern District of Texas and assigned to the Honorable James Edgar Kinkeade.(P,R) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 3/28/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (D,TM) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 3/28/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (D,TM) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 3/28/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 Supplement - Summons, filed by Donna L. Thoms. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Demsey, Richard) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 3/28/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Random Assignment [non-document] of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (D,TM) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 3/28/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (D,TM) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 3/28/2019.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0647-8965887.. Filed by Donna L. Thoms. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 List of Defendant) (Demsey, Richard) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 3/28/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thoms v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Products Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Orthopaedics Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy International Limited
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Special Master
Represented By: James M Stanton-2244
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna L Thoms
Represented By: Richard L. Demsey
Represented By: Justin D. Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?