Jacke v. Depuy Orthopaedics et al

Plaintiff: Sandy Jacke
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services Inc, Does 3-10, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy International Limited, DePuy Synthes Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, DePuy Inc and Medical Device Business Services Inc
Special Master: Special Master
Case Number: 3:2019cv00858
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Pers Inj/Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 Case electronically transferred in from District of Montana; Case Number 6:19-cv-00020. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 Transfer Order (MDL) from Northern District of Texas requesting transfer of action. Entire case file sent to requesting District via CM/ECF. (JEC) [Transferred from Montana on 4/9/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Conditional Transfer Order. Awaiting certified copy of order from Transferee Court. (HEG) [Transferred from Montana on 4/9/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sandy Jacke. (HEG) [Transferred from Montana on 4/9/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATE COURT ORDER. Signed by Judge James P. Reynolds on 2/12/2019. (HEG) [Transferred from Montana on 4/9/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sandy Jacke. (HEG) [Transferred from Montana on 4/9/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Lewis and Clark County Case Register Report. All original state court documents retained on open civil shelf. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (HEG) [Transferred from Montana on 4/9/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2276448. (HEG) [Transferred from Montana on 4/9/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DePuy Inc., Johnson & Johnson International, Depuy International Limited, Depuy Orthopaedics, Johnson & Johnson Services, Johnson & Johnson, DePuy Synthes, Inc. from Montana First Judicial District Court, L&C County, case number DDV-2016-352., filed by Defendants. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (HEG) [Transferred from Montana on 4/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacke v. Depuy Orthopaedics et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Maxon R Davis
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 3-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Maxon R Davis
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy International Limited
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Maxon R Davis
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Synthes Inc
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Maxon R Davis
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Maxon R Davis
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson International
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Maxon R Davis
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Inc
Represented By: Maxon R Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Device Business Services Inc
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Maxon R Davis
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Special Master
Represented By: James M Stanton-2244
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Jacke
Represented By: Micheal F Lamb
Represented By: James Patrick Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?