United States of America v. Rodriguez et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Cesar B Pena Rodriguez and Leovares A Mendez
Case Number: 3:2019cv01055
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 21:841
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 (Document Restricted) Notice of Execution of Search Warrants filed by United States of America. (mla)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Ex Parte TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/8/2019) (rekc)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Ex Parte Order Granting #3 Motion to File Under Seal. The seal will expire when the search warrants are executed. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/8/2019) (rekc)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 Ex Parte Notice of Supplemental Evidence in Support of the United States' Emergency Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by United States of America. (rekc)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Leovares A Mendez, Cesar B Pena Rodriguez. (ykp)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America. (ykp)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 Ex Parte Appendix in Support re: #4 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (ykp)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 The United States of America's Emergency Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (ykp)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File to File Documents Under Seal filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (ykp)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Leovares A Mendez, Cesar B Pena Rodriguez filed by United States of America. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ykp)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Rodriguez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cesar B Pena Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leovares A Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Arturo A DeCastro
Represented By: Lindsey E Beran-DOJ
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Delaney-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?