Chunara v. RS Clark and Associates Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ameen Chunara
Defendant: RS Clark and Associates Inc and City Limits Apartments
Case Number: 3:2019cv01072
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Ameen Chunara (Jaffer, Shawn)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer City Limits Apartments answer due 7/2/2019; RS Clark and Associates Inc answer due 7/2/2019. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 6/14/2019) (rekc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by City Limits Apartments (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer)Attorney Jerry Leroy Carlton added to party City Limits Apartments(pty:dft) (Carlton, Jerry)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to City Limits Apartments ; served on 5/28/2019. (Jaffer, Shawn)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to RS Clark and Associates Inc ; served on 5/28/2019. (Jaffer, Shawn)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City Limits Apartments, RS Clark and Associates Inc. (zkc)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ameen Chunara. (Jaffer, Shawn)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Ameen Chunara. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9963162) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A) (Jaffer, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chunara v. RS Clark and Associates Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RS Clark and Associates Inc
Represented By: Baxter W Banowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Limits Apartments
Represented By: Jerry Leroy Carlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ameen Chunara
Represented By: Shawn Jaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?