Le-Vel Brands LLC v. Speck et al

Plaintiff: Le-Vel Brands LLC
Defendant: Mindi D'Elia and Breann Speck
Not Yet Classified: ADR Provider
Case Number: 3:2019cv01097
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Referring Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:24. Fri May 24 12:51:35 CDT 2019 (crt)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Agreed Temporary Restraining Order (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/23/2019) (ykp)
May 21, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Entry of Agreed Temporary Restraining Order filed by Le-Vel Brands LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Graham, Parker)
May 21, 2019 Filing 22 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Le-Vel Brands LLC. (Graham, Parker)
May 20, 2019 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Status Conference held on 5/20/2019. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Monica Latin and Parker Graham; Defense - Micala Bernardo and Andrew Velazquez. (Court Reporter: Lanie Smith) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :52. (chmb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Proposed Expedited Discovery filed by Le-Vel Brands LLC (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Draft Proposed Expedited Discovery) (Latin, Monica)
May 17, 2019 Filing 20 Supplemental Notice of Removal by Mindi D'Elia, Breann Speck as to #1 Notice of Removal. (Bernardo, Micala) Modified on 5/20/2019 to enhance text (dss).
May 17, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:19. Fri May 17 12:10:10 CDT 2019 (crt)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints William Royal Furgeson as mediator. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 6/17/2019. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/17/2019) (ykp)
May 17, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Mindi D'Elia, Breann Speck re: #6 MOTION for Status Conference, Expedited Discovery, and (if necessary) to Extend Temporary Restraining Order Pending the Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bernardo, Micala)
May 17, 2019 Filing 17 Appendix in Support filed by Le-Vel Brands LLC re #16 Response/Objection to Defendants' Motion to Dissolve Agreed TRO (Graham, Parker)
May 17, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by Le-Vel Brands LLC re: #9 Notice (Other) (Graham, Parker)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants in part Plaintiff's Motion [ECF No. 6]. The Court grants the Motion for Status Conference and sets this case for a status conference and hearing on Monday, May 20, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. At the hearing, the Court will address Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery, Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order, and Defendants' Motion to Dissolve or Modify Temporary Restraining Order. Responses, if any, shall be filed by noon on Friday, May 17, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/14/2019) (chmb)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Until Defendants allege Plaintiffs citizenship, this Court is not shown to have subject matter jurisdiction. Accordingly, no later than 14 days from the date of this Order, Defendants must file an amended notice of removal that alleges diversity of citizenship, in conformity with 28 USC 1332; otherwise, this action will be remanded to state court. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/14/2019) (mla)
May 14, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act filed by Mindi D'Elia, Breann Speck (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order) (Bernardo, Micala) Modified event on 5/14/2019 (aaa).
May 14, 2019 Filing 12 Appendix in Support filed by Mindi D'Elia, Breann Speck re #11 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and For Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Bernardo, Micala)
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and For Failure to State a Claim filed by Mindi D'Elia, Breann Speck with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bernardo, Micala)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The above-referenced matter is transferred to the docket of the Honorable Judge Karen Gren Scholer, who has a related case. All future pleadings shall be filed under case number 3:19-CV-01097-S. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/13/2019) (aaa)
May 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion to Dissolve or Modify Temporary Restraining Order filed by Mindi D'Elia, Breann Speck (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order) (Bernardo, Micala)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE filed by Le-Vel Brands LLC re: #5 Notice (Other) (Graham, Parker)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 Appendix in Support filed by Le-Vel Brands LLC re #6 MOTION for Status Conference, Expedited Discovery, and (if necessary) to Extend Temporary Restraining Order Pending the Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Graham, Parker)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Status Conference, Expedited Discovery, and (if necessary) to Extend Temporary Restraining Order Pending the Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by Le-Vel Brands LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion) (Graham, Parker)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Indirectly Related Case filed by Mindi D'Elia, Breann Speck. (Bernardo, Micala)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mindi D'Elia, Breann Speck. (Bernardo, Micala)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Additional Attachments to the Main Document by Mindi D'Elia, Breann Speck as to #1 Notice of Removal, Cover Sheet and Supplemental Cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Bernardo, Micala) Modified text on 5/7/2019 (ykp).
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 101st Judicial District Court, case number DC-19-05724 filed by Breann Speck, Mindi D'Elia. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9970331) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Index of State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit(s) A-1, #3 Exhibit(s) A-2, #4 Exhibit(s) A-3, #5 Exhibit(s) A-4, #6 Exhibit(s) A-5, #7 Exhibit(s) A-6, #8 Exhibit(s) A-7, #9 Exhibit(s) A-8, #10 Exhibit(s) A-9, #11 Exhibit(s) A-10, #12 Exhibit(s) A-11, #13 Exhibit(s) A-12, #14 Exhibit(s) A-13, #15 Exhibit(s) A-14, #16 Exhibit(s) A-15, #17 Exhibit(s) A-16, #18 Exhibit(s) A-17, #19 Exhibit(s) A-18, #20 Exhibit(s) A-19, #21 Exhibit(s) A-20, #22 Exhibit(s) A-21, #23 Exhibit(s) A-22, #24 Exhibit(s) A-23, #25 Exhibit(s) A-24, #26 Exhibit(s) A-25, #27 Exhibit(s) A-26, #28 Exhibit(s) A-27, #29 Exhibit(s) A-28, #30 Exhibit(s) A-29, #31 Exhibit(s) A-30, #32 Exhibit(s) A-31, #33 Exhibit(s) A-32, #34 Exhibit(s) A-33, #35 Exhibit(s) A-34) (Bernardo, Micala)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Le-Vel Brands LLC v. Speck et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mindi D'Elia
Represented By: Marc D Katz
Represented By: Micala Rae Bernardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breann Speck
Represented By: Marc D Katz
Represented By: Micala Rae Bernardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Le-Vel Brands LLC
Represented By: Parker Lee Graham
Represented By: Monica Wiseman Latin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ADR Provider
Represented By: William Royal Furgeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?