Quilling v. Dynex Capital Inc
Plaintiff: Michael J. Quilling and Michael J Quilling
Defendant: Dynex Capital Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01142
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Michael J Quilling re: #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Doss, Lawrence)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence M Doss on behalf of Michael J Quilling. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Doss, Lawrence)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting in part #8 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 7/8/2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 6/20/2019) (mla)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Michael J Quilling (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Will, Clark)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's #4 Motion to Dismiss. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 6/19/2019) (rekc)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Michael J Quilling (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Will, Clark)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/15/2019. Discovery due by 10/13/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 10/15/2019. Motions due by 6/1/2020. Trial set for 11/2/2020 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 6/12/2019) (rekc)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dynex Capital Inc (Fernandes, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dynex Capital Inc. (Fernandes, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 68th Judicial District, Dallas County, Texas, case number DC-19-06737 filed by Dynex Capital Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9982691) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Index of Documents, #2 Exhibit(s) B - State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit(s) C - State Court Filings, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E - State Court Notice of Removal, #6 Cover Sheet, #7 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Fernandes, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quilling v. Dynex Capital Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynex Capital Inc
Represented By: John C Eichman
Represented By: Edward F Fernandes
Represented By: Christopher H Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Quilling
Represented By: Clark B Will
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Quilling
Represented By: Clark B Will
Represented By: Lawrence M Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?