Monterey Resources LLC v. 405 Arapahoe LLC et al
Plaintiff: Monterey Resources, LLC and Monterey Resources LLC
Defendant: Arena Investors, LP, 405 Arapahoe, LLC, 405 Arapahoe LLC and Arena Investors LP
Case Number: 3:2019cv01144
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #10 Third Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. 405 Arapahoe LLC answer or response due 7/31/2019; Arena Investors LP answer or response due 7/31/2019. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/2/2019) (chmb)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by 405 Arapahoe LLC, Arena Investors LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Agreed Order Extending Time to File Responsive Pleading) (Trowbridge, Christopher)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond. 405 Arapahoe LLC answer or response due 7/1/2019; Arena Investors LP answer or response due 7/1/2019. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/18/2019) (chmb)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by 405 Arapahoe LLC, Arena Investors LP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Order Extending Time to File Responsive Pleading) (Trowbridge, Christopher)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Keith French. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/21/2019) (chmb)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond. 405 Arapahoe LLC answer or response due 6/17/2019; Arena Investors LP answer or response due 6/17/2019. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/21/2019) (chmb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Plead filed by 405 Arapahoe LLC, Arena Investors LP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Order Extending Time to File Responsive Pleading) (Trowbridge, Christopher)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9989635) filed by 405 Arapahoe LLC, Arena Investors LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) Attorney Keith Bernard French, Jr added to party 405 Arapahoe LLC (pty:dft), party Arena Investors LP (pty:dft). (French, Keith)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 405 Arapahoe, LLC, Arena Investors, LP. (Trowbridge, Christopher)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 101st District Court of Dallas County, Texas, case number DC-19-05466 filed by Arena Investors, LP, 405 Arapahoe, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9982792) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Trowbridge, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monterey Resources LLC v. 405 Arapahoe LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arena Investors, LP
Represented By: Christopher B Trowbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 405 Arapahoe, LLC
Represented By: Christopher B Trowbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 405 Arapahoe LLC
Represented By: Keith Bernard French, Jr
Represented By: Christopher B Trowbridge
Represented By: Kristopher Dennis Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arena Investors LP
Represented By: Keith Bernard French, Jr
Represented By: Christopher B Trowbridge
Represented By: Kristopher Dennis Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monterey Resources, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monterey Resources LLC
Represented By: Jane W Cherry
Represented By: Craig Thomas Stoddart
Represented By: Julie Pettit
Represented By: David Blake Urteago
Represented By: Michael K Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?