Yang v. The Daily Wire LLC
Plaintiff: Stephen Yang
Defendant: The Daily Wire, LLC and The Daily Wire LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01146
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 8/6/2019. See order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 7/15/2019) (lag/chmb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Daily Wire LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Bentkey Ventures, LLC for The Daily Wire LLC. (Cohen, Justin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by The Daily Wire LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Cohen, Justin)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The Daily Wire LLC answer due 7/12/2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 6/7/2019) (mla)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by The Daily Wire LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cohen, Justin)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin S Cohen on behalf of The Daily Wire LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Cohen, Justin)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Coles on behalf of Stephen Yang. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Coles, Michael)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, within twenty days of this date, the plaintiff shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so will result in dismissal without prejudice of this case without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 5/22/2019) (ndt)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (svc)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The Daily Wire LLC. (svc)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (svc)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Stephen Yang. (Liebowitz, Richard)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against The Daily Wire, LLC filed by Stephen Yang. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9983453) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yang v. The Daily Wire LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Daily Wire, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Daily Wire LLC
Represented By: Justin S Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Yang
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Represented By: Michael E Coles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?