Coleman v. United States Postmaster General et al
Plaintiff: Anesha Nicolay Coleman
Defendant: Cindy Greg, Larry Wagener, Jr Sr, Brittany Lindsay, Geraldine Fulton, Ms NFN Roberts, Albert Ruiz, Rosemary Greer, Patricia Groom, Kamalammal Pillai, James Heard, Patricia Thigpen, Megan Brennan, Kyioka M Rahim, Elvin A Remembert and Gary Vaccarella
Case Number: 3:2019cv01155
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Federal Employers' Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE filed by Anesha Nicolay Coleman re: #8 Order And Notice of Deficiency. (ykp)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Anesha Nicolay Coleman must address the following deficiency: The complaint does not meet the basic pleading requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8(a) and the motion to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP) is also deficient. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 7/15/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/21/2019) (epm)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Anesha Nicolay Coleman (svc)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE re: Evidence filed by Anesha Nicolay Coleman. (rekc)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER: Plaintiff Anesha Nicolay Coleman must address the following deficiency: The motion to proceed in forma pauperis does not provide enough information to determine whether Plaintiff should be granted in forma pauperis status. Specifically, Plaintiff failed to respond to the inquiries in the monthly expense section of the motion; "N/A" or zero is not a sufficient response. Plaintiff must also explain who pays her living expenses. Therefore, Plaintiff is ORDERED to fully respond to every inquiry in the motion to proceed in forma pauperis on the AO 239 Form and to resubmit it to the Court by 6/14/2019. A motion to proceed in forma pauperis (AO 239 Form) is available online at http://www.txnd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/forms/AO239_0.pdf. No process will issue except upon order of the Court.PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER MAY RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(b). Further, a review of the docket reveals that Plaintiff has not yet registered as a user of the Court's electronic filing system, as required. In the event Plaintiff has not already done so, she is ORDERED to register for electronic filing through this Court's CM/ECF system, as required by Northern District of Texas Local Civil Rule 5.1(f), by 6/14/2019. Instructions for registering are found online at https://ecf.txnd.uscourts.gov/AttorneyReg/. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 5/24/2019) (chmb)
May 16, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Thu May 16 10:31:09 CDT 2019 (crt)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Anesha Nicolay Coleman (ykp)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Anesha Nicolay Coleman. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ykp)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (ykp)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. United States Postmaster General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Greg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Wagener, Jr Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geraldine Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms NFN Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemary Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Groom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamalammal Pillai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Heard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Thigpen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyioka M Rahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elvin A Remembert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Vaccarella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anesha Nicolay Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?