Benson v. United Investexusa 10 LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kory Benson and Koye Temilola Benson
Defendant: Paul Hess, United Investexusa 10 LLC, Stuart Denyer, UI Holdings LLC, United Investexusa 2 and Kurt Carlton
Case Number: 3:2019cv01161
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Federal Employers' Liability
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kurt Carlton, Stuart Denyer, Paul Hess, UI Holdings LLC, United Investexusa 10 LLC, United Investexusa 2. (Jones, Molly)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Kurt Carlton, Stuart Denyer, Paul Hess, UI Holdings LLC, United Investexusa 10 LLC, United Investexusa 2. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Modified on 6/28/2019 (rekc).
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Agreed STIPULATION On Defendants' service and extending time to answer by Koye Temilola Benson. (Ashmore, KC)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kurt Carlton, Stuart Denyer, Paul Hess, UI Holdings LLC, United Investexusa 10 LLC, United Investexusa 2. (rekc)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Koye Temilola Benson. (Ashmore, KC) Modified plaintiff on 5/16/2019 (mla).
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Koye Temilola Benson. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9987054) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Ashmore, KC) Modified plaintiff on 5/16/2019 (mla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benson v. United Investexusa 10 LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Hess
Represented By: Brant C Martin
Represented By: Molly Jones
Represented By: Zachary C Farrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Investexusa 10 LLC
Represented By: Brant C Martin
Represented By: Molly Jones
Represented By: Zachary C Farrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Denyer
Represented By: Brant C Martin
Represented By: Molly Jones
Represented By: Zachary C Farrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UI Holdings LLC
Represented By: Brant C Martin
Represented By: Molly Jones
Represented By: Zachary C Farrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Investexusa 2
Represented By: Brant C Martin
Represented By: Molly Jones
Represented By: Zachary C Farrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Carlton
Represented By: Brant C Martin
Represented By: Molly Jones
Represented By: Zachary C Farrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kory Benson
Represented By: KC Ashmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Koye Temilola Benson
Represented By: KC Ashmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?