Hardaway v. ABM Aviation
Plaintiff: Monica M Hardaway
Defendant: ABM Aviation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01181
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11. Tue Jun 25 11:24:12 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation re: #9 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration and Brief in Support. Based on the relevant filings and applicable law, the case should be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute or follow orders of the court, and the motion to dismiss should be denied as moot. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 6/25/2019) (mcrd)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot #7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss based on the subsequent filing of an identical motion that also contains a cover sheet and table of contents. (See doc. 9.) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 6/25/2019) (Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration filed by ABM Aviation with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Whiting, Simon)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 Appendix in Support filed by ABM Aviation re #7 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration and Brief in Support (Whiting, Simon)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration filed by ABM Aviation with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Simon D Whiting added to party ABM Aviation (pty:dft) (Whiting, Simon)
May 22, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 5, 6. Wed May 22 16:53:38 CDT 2019 (crt)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER: Monica M Hardaway must address the following deficiency: The plaintiff has not paid the filing fee for this case or submitted a request to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of the lawsuit under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 14 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 5/22/2019) (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (zkc)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 5/22/2019) (zkc)
May 17, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Fri May 17 10:44:41 CDT 2019 (crt)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Monica M Hardaway. (aaa)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against ABM Aviation filed by Monica M Hardaway. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (aaa)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (aaa)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardaway v. ABM Aviation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica M Hardaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM Aviation
Represented By: Simon D Whiting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?