Vance v. United States Department of Labor

Plaintiff: Cheryl E Vance
Defendant: United States Department of Labor and US Postal Inspection Service
Case Number: 3:2019cv01183
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Magistrate Judge's Questionnaire sent to Cheryl E. Vance. Responses due by 7/15/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/21/2019) (rekc)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Cheryl E Vance. Clerk to issue summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Vance, Cheryl)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Cheryl E Vance must address the following deficiency: The complaint does not meet the basic pleading requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8(a). Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended complaint that meets the pleading requirements of Rule 8(a) by 6/14/2019. A form complaint for use in civil cases ("Pro Se 1") is available online at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms. In the event Plaintiff has not already done so, she is also ORDERED to register for electronic filing through this Court's CM/ECF system, as required by Northern District of Texas Local Civil Rule 5.1(f), by 6/14/2019. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 5/24/2019) (axm)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #3 Complaint, by Plaintiff Cheryl E Vance. (Vance, Cheryl)
May 17, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Fri May 17 11:07:29 CDT 2019 (crt)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cheryl E Vance. (aaa)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cheryl E Vance. (aaa)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Labor filed by Cheryl E Vance. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (aaa)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (aaa)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vance v. United States Department of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl E Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Postal Inspection Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?