Ponder v. Crews et al
Plaintiff: Carmen Ponder
Defendant: Kerry Crews, City of Commerce, Texas and City of Commerce Texas
Case Number: 3:2019cv01205
Filed: May 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by City of Commerce Texas. (Jeffrey, James)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Commerce Texas with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney James T Jeffrey, Jr added to party City of Commerce Texas(pty:dft) (Jeffrey, James)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a reply, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7(a), to Defendant Kerry Crews' assertion of qualified immunity within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. Furthermore, this Order shallserve as notice that failure to comply with the requirements herein will result in the dismissal of Plaintiff's claims against the party asserting the affirmative defense of qualified immunity. All discovery is stayed until further order of the Court. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 7/8/2019) (ykp)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Kerry Crews. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Tooley, Joe)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kerry Crews. (Tooley, Joe)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kerry Crews. (Tooley, Joe)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Kerry Crews re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Tooley, Joe)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kerry Crews Attorney Joe C Tooley added to party Kerry Crews(pty:dft) (Tooley, Joe)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to City of Commerce Texas, served on 6/24/2019; Kerry Crews, served on 6/24/2019. (Coyle, John) Modified on 7/1/2019 (zkc).
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John Coyle. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 6/14/2019) (svc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10050536) filed by Carmen Ponder (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) A: Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney John Joseph Coyle added to party Carmen Ponder(pty:pla) (Coyle, John)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Carmen Ponder. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Merritt, Stacy Sylvester)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carmen Ponder. (Merritt, Stacy Sylvester)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of Commerce, Texas, Kerry Crews. (ndt)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Kerry Crews, City of Commerce, Texas filed by Carmen Ponder. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0539-9995587) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Merritt, Stacy Sylvester) Modified text on 5/20/2019 (epm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ponder v. Crews et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Ponder
Represented By: Stacy Sylvester Lee Merritt, Sr
Represented By: John Joseph Coyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry Crews
Represented By: Joe C Tooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Commerce, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Commerce Texas
Represented By: James T Jeffrey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?