Obama v. Internal Revenue Service

Plaintiff: Zaesliv H Obama and Shanta Y Claiborne
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 3:2019cv01208
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 Mail returned as undeliverable. #6 Findings and Recommendations on Case received back from Zaesliv H Obama as attenpted - not known, unable to forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (axm)
June 12, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7,8. Wed Jun 12 15:30:50 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT: The Court has entered its Order Accepting the Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge in this case. It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/12/2019) (ndt)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Accepting #6 Findings, Conclusions and Recommendations. The court certifies that any appeal of this action would not be taken in good faith. re: #3 Complaint, filed by Zaesliv H Obama. Plaintiff is WARNED that if she persists in filing frivolous or baseless actions or actions over which the Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction, the Court may impose monetary sanctions and/or bar her from bringing any further action. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/12/2019) (ndt) Modified on 6/14/2019 (ali).
May 24, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Fri May 24 15:35:36 CDT 2019 (crt)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re: #3 Complaint: This action should be summarily DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Plaintiff should also be WARNED that if she persists in filing frivolous or baseless actions or actions over which the Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction, the Court may impose monetary sanctions and/or bar her from bringing any further action. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 5/24/2019) (axm)
May 24, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Fri May 24 15:07:50 CDT 2019 (crt)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. No process will issue pending completion of screening. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 5/24/2019) (chmb)
May 21, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Tue May 21 09:21:15 CDT 2019 (crt)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Zaesliv H Obama. (mla)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service filed by Zaesliv H Obama. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mla)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mla)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Obama v. Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zaesliv H Obama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanta Y Claiborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?