Matthews v. United Healthcare Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: Lisa G Matthews
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc., Unitedhealthcare Benefits of Texas, Inc., MetDalSpi, LLC, Safe Guidance, LLC, UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc., MetDalSpi LLC, UnitedHealthcare Benefits of Texas Inc, Safe Guidance LLC, UnitedHealthcare of Texas Inc, United Healthcare Services Inc and US Anesthesia Partners of Texas PA
Case Number: 3:2019cv01212
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE filed by United Healthcare Services Inc re: #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Clack, Lance)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time. The deadline for Defendants United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare of Texas, Inc., and United Healthcare Benefits of Texas, Inc. to respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand is extended to 7/17/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 7/8/2019) (ykp)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Response to Motion to Remand filed by United Healthcare Services Inc, UnitedHealthcare Benefits of Texas Inc, UnitedHealthcare of Texas Inc (Clack, Lance)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Lisa G Matthews with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Marsh, Curtis)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order (Joint Report) by United Healthcare Services Inc, UnitedHealthcare Benefits of Texas Inc, UnitedHealthcare of Texas Inc. (Clack, Lance)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 6/19/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/29/2019) (mla)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Healthcare Services Inc, UnitedHealthcare of Texas Inc, Unitedhealthcare Benefits of Texas, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for United Healthcare Services Inc, UnitedHealthcare of Texas Inc, Unitedhealthcare Benefits of Texas, Inc.. (Clack, Lance)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 44th District Court, Dallas County, case number DC-19-05097 filed by United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9998066) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A, #4 Exhibit(s) B, #5 Exhibit(s) C, #6 Exhibit(s) D, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5, #12 Exhibit(s) D-6, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10, #17 Exhibit(s) D-11, #18 Exhibit(s) D-12, #19 Exhibit(s) D-13, #20 Exhibit(s) E) (Clack, Lance)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthews v. United Healthcare Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Represented By: Lance V Clack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unitedhealthcare Benefits of Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Represented By: Lance V Clack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetDalSpi, LLC
Represented By: Nichol L Bunn
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Drumm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safe Guidance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Represented By: Lance V Clack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetDalSpi LLC
Represented By: Nichol L Bunn
Represented By: Brooke Bennett Aziere
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Drumm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Benefits of Texas Inc
Represented By: Lance V Clack
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safe Guidance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of Texas Inc
Represented By: Lance V Clack
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services Inc
Represented By: Lance V Clack
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Anesthesia Partners of Texas PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa G Matthews
Represented By: Curtis L Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?