Tucker v. BBVA Compass Bank et al
Plaintiff: Eddie L. Tucker and Eddie L Tucker
Defendant: Cedric Brown, BBVA Compass Bank, Charles C Guimm, III, Walter Irvin, Ray McDonald, CEDRIC BROOKS and Walter L Irvin
Case Number: 3:2019cv01213
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Cedric Brown. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (aaa)
July 12, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:12. Fri Jul 12 08:17:21 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order: Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause by a written response, filed no later than 8/2/2019, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject- matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 7/11/2019) (ndt)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walter L Irvin. (Irvin, Walter)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Walter L Irvin. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Walter L. Irvin added to party Walter L Irvin(pty:dft) (Irvin, Walter)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to BBVA Compass Bank, Cedric Brown, Charles C Guimm, III, Walter L Irvin, Ray McDonald. (ndt)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Eddie L Tucker. (ndt)
May 21, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Tue May 21 14:11:24 CDT 2019 (crt)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER AND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY. Plaintiff Eddie L. Tucker must address the following deficiency: Plaintiff did not pay the required filing fee or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis on the court approved form. See 28 U.S.C. 1914, 1915(a). Therefore, Plaintiff is ORDERED to pay the required $400.00 filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on the AO-239 form, by 6/12/2019. PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER MAY RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(b). A motion to proceed in forma pauperis on the AO239 form (AO 239) is available online at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms. No process will issue except upon order of the Court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 5/21/2019) (chmb)
May 20, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5,6. Mon May 20 16:57:16 CDT 2019 (crt)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (epm)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (epm)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Case electronically transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-01044. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Northern District of Texas. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 5/20/2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/29/2019. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/20/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by EDDIE L. TUCKER (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/20/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by EDDIE L. TUCKER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement)(zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/20/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 04/12/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. BBVA Compass Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedric Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBVA Compass Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles C Guimm, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEDRIC BROOKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter L Irvin
Represented By: Walter L. Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie L. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie L Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?