Texas Pacific Land Trust et al v. Oliver
Plaintiff: Texas Pacific Land Trust, David E Barry and John R Norris, III
Defendant: Eric L Oliver
Counter Claimant: Horizon Kinetics LLC, SoftVest LP and ART-FGT Family Partners Limited
Case Number: 3:2019cv01224
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 55 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by David E Barry, John R Norris, III, Texas Pacific Land Trust re #54 Expedited MOTION for Limited Discovery Related to Counter-Plaintiffs' Declaratory Judgment and Preliminary Injunction Motion. (Garcia, Yolanda)
July 18, 2019 Filing 54 Expedited MOTION for Limited Discovery Related to Counter-Plaintiffs' Declaratory Judgment and Preliminary Injunction Motion filed by David E Barry, John R Norris, III, Texas Pacific Land Trust (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Garcia, Yolanda) Modified title on 7/19/2019 (axm).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: Motions regarding discovery due by 7/18/2019. Responses due by 7/22/2019. Replies due by 7/23/2019. Plaintiff's Motion for a Declaratory Judgment and Preliminary Injunction is set for a hearing to begin on September 25-26, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/15/2019) (rekc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 52 RESPONSE filed by David E Barry, John R Norris, III, Texas Pacific Land Trust re: #21 MOTION for Judicial Notice re #19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, #20 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ostolaza, Yvette)
July 15, 2019 Filing 51 RESPONSE filed by David E Barry, John R Norris, III, Texas Pacific Land Trust re: #19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ostolaza, Yvette)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #46 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits. The Court grants Plaintiffs leave to file a 35-page response brief to Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings (Doc. 19). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/15/2019) (chmb)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #39 Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits. The Court grants Counterclaim Plaintiffs leave to file a thirty-page memorandum of law in support of their motion for a declaratory judgment and preliminary injunction. Additionally, the Court grants Counterclaim Defendants leave to file a thirty-page response brief to the motion. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/15/2019) (chmb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 48 Agreed MOTION for Discovery for Entry of an Order Setting a Schedule and Discovery Protocol for Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Motion for a Declaratory Judgment and Preliminary Injunction filed by David E Barry, John R Norris, III, Texas Pacific Land Trust (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ostolaza, Yvette)
July 12, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE to The Court Regarding Unopposed Motion For Entry Of An Order Setting A Schedule For Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Motion for a Declaratory Judgment and Preliminary Injunction filed by David E Barry, John R Norris, III, Texas Pacific Land Trust (Ostolaza, Yvette)
July 12, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits filed by David E Barry, John R Norris, III, Texas Pacific Land Trust (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Ostolaza, Yvette)
July 8, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION Unopposed Motion for an Order Setting a Schedule For Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Motion for a Declaratory Judgment and Preliminary Injunction filed by ART-FGT Family Partners Limited, Horizon Kinetics LLC, Eric L Oliver, SoftVest LP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Falconer, Russell)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #43 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tyler H. Amass. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/1/2019) (chmb)
July 1, 2019 Filing 43 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Tyler H. Amass (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10088991) filed by ART-FGT Family Partners Limited, Horizon Kinetics LLC, Eric L Oliver, SoftVest LP (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Falconer, Russell)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER STAYING ALL DISCOVERY: The Court holds that Defendant's 12(c) motion triggers the automatic discovery stay of the PSLRA. The Court therefore ORDERS that all discovery and other proceedings in this matter are STAYED until Defendant's #19 motion for judgment on the pleadings is resolved. Additionally, fourteen days after the Court enters its ruling on the Defendant's motion, the parties shall file a joint proposed discovery schedule. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/25/2019) (mla)
June 25, 2019 Filing 41 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by ART-FGT Family Partners Limited, Horizon Kinetics LLC, Eric L Oliver, SoftVest LP re #40 MOTION for Hearing re #36 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment and Preliminary Injunction (Falconer, Russell)
June 25, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Hearing re #36 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment and Preliminary Injunction filed by ART-FGT Family Partners Limited, Horizon Kinetics LLC, Eric L Oliver, SoftVest LP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Falconer, Russell)
June 25, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limits (Unopposed) re #37 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by ART-FGT Family Partners Limited, Horizon Kinetics LLC, Eric L Oliver, SoftVest LP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Falconer, Russell)
June 25, 2019 Filing 38 Appendix in Support filed by ART-FGT Family Partners Limited, Horizon Kinetics LLC, Eric L Oliver, SoftVest LP re #36 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment and Preliminary Injunction, #37 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Falconer, Russell)
June 25, 2019 Filing 37 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by ART-FGT Family Partners Limited, Horizon Kinetics LLC, Eric L Oliver, SoftVest LP re #36 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment and Preliminary Injunction (Falconer, Russell)
June 25, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment and Preliminary Injunction filed by ART-FGT Family Partners Limited, Horizon Kinetics LLC, Eric L Oliver, SoftVest LP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Falconer, Russell)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #34 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall answer or otherwise respond to Defendant's counterclaims or file counterclaims against Counter-Plaintiffs on or before July 26, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/25/2019) (chmb)
June 25, 2019 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Defendants counterclaims and to assert counterclaims against the Counter-Plaintiffs filed by David E Barry, John R Norris, III, Texas Pacific Land Trust (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ostolaza, Yvette)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #29 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Luke A. Dougherty. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/25/2019) (chmb)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #28 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter M. Wade. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/25/2019) (chmb)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #26 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adam H. Offenhartz. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/25/2019) (chmb)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #27 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Aric H. Wu. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/25/2019) (chmb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 29 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Luke A. Dougherty (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10070586) filed by ART-FGT Family Partners Limited, Horizon Kinetics LLC, Eric L Oliver, SoftVest LP (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Falconer, Russell)
June 24, 2019 Filing 28 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Peter M. Wade (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10070578) filed by ART-FGT Family Partners Limited, Horizon Kinetics LLC, Eric L Oliver, SoftVest LP (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Falconer, Russell)
June 24, 2019 Filing 27 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Aric H. Wu (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10070560) filed by ART-FGT Family Partners Limited, Horizon Kinetics LLC, Eric L Oliver, SoftVest LP (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Falconer, Russell)
June 24, 2019 Filing 26 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Adam H. Offenhartz (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10070502) filed by ART-FGT Family Partners Limited, Horizon Kinetics LLC, Eric L Oliver, SoftVest LP (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Falconer, Russell)
June 21, 2019 Filing 25 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan Under Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 26(F) by David E Barry, John R Norris, III, Texas Pacific Land Trust. (Garcia, Yolanda)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #23 Agreed Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall now file their response to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on or before July 15, 2019. Defendant shall file its reply on or before August 5, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/21/2019) (chmb)
June 20, 2019 Filing 23 Agreed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Motion filed by David E Barry, John R Norris, III, Texas Pacific Land Trust (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ostolaza, Yvette)
June 18, 2019 Filing 22 Amended COUNTERCLAIM against David E Barry, John R Norris, III filed by Horizon Kinetics LLC, Eric L Oliver, SoftVest LP, ART-FGT Family Partners Limited (Falconer, Russell)
June 17, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Judicial Notice re #19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, #20 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Eric L Oliver with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-25, #2 Exhibit(s) 26-40, #3 Exhibit(s) 41-74, #4 Proposed Order) (Falconer, Russell)
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Eric L Oliver re #19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Falconer, Russell)
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Eric L Oliver (Falconer, Russell)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Lead counsel for each party (or a designee attorney with appropriate authority) must meet face-to-face at a mutually agreeable location, and no later than seven (7) calendar days before the Joint Status Report due date. Status Report due by 6/21/2019. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/31/2019) (ykp)
May 28, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint filed by Eric L Oliver. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. COUNTERCLAIM of Eric L Oliver, SoftVest LP, Horizon Kinetics LLC, and ART-FGT Family Partners Limited against David E Barry, John R Norris, III filed by Eric L Oliver. Attorney Russell H Falconer added to party Eric L Oliver (pty:dft). (Falconer, Russell)
May 23, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Certificate of Service of Amended Complaint filed by David E Barry, John R Norris, III, Texas Pacific Land Trust (Ostolaza, Yvette)
May 22, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Eric L Oliver filed by Texas Pacific Land Trust, John R Norris, III, David E Barry. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ostolaza, Yvette)
May 22, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Eric L Oliver, served on 5/22/2019. (Ostolaza, Yvette) Modified served date on 5/23/2019 (mla).
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew W. Stern. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/22/2019) (chmb)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alex J. Kaplan. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/22/2019) (chmb)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jon Muenz. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/22/2019) (chmb)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Jon Muenz (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10004202) filed by David E Barry, John R Norris, III, Texas Pacific Land Trust (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ostolaza, Yvette)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Alex J. Kaplan (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10004158) filed by David E Barry, John R Norris, III, Texas Pacific Land Trust (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ostolaza, Yvette)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Andrew W. Stern (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10004127) filed by David E Barry, John R Norris, III, Texas Pacific Land Trust (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ostolaza, Yvette)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Eric L Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (ndt)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by David E Barry, John R Norris, III, Texas Pacific Land Trust. (Ostolaza, Yvette)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by David E Barry, John R Norris, III, Texas Pacific Land Trust. (Ostolaza, Yvette)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS, Civil Cover Sheet, to #1 Complaint by Plaintiffs David E Barry, John R Norris, III, Texas Pacific Land Trust. (Ostolaza, Yvette)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by David E Barry, John R Norris, III, Texas Pacific Land Trust. (Ostolaza, Yvette)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eric L Oliver filed by Texas Pacific Land Trust, John R Norris, III, David E Barry. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10000577) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ostolaza, Yvette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texas Pacific Land Trust et al v. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Pacific Land Trust
Represented By: Yvette Ostolaza
Represented By: Yolanda Cornejo Garcia
Represented By: Tiffanie Limbrick
Represented By: Jon Muenz
Represented By: Andrew Stern
Represented By: Alex J Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David E Barry
Represented By: Yvette Ostolaza
Represented By: Yolanda Cornejo Garcia
Represented By: Tiffanie Limbrick
Represented By: Jon Muenz
Represented By: Andrew Stern
Represented By: Alex J Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R Norris, III
Represented By: Yvette Ostolaza
Represented By: Yolanda Cornejo Garcia
Represented By: Tiffanie Limbrick
Represented By: Jon Muenz
Represented By: Andrew Stern
Represented By: Alex J Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric L Oliver
Represented By: Russell H Falconer
Represented By: Peter M Wade
Represented By: Aric W Wu
Represented By: Luke A Dougherty
Represented By: Olivia Arden Adendorff
Represented By: Robert C Walters
Represented By: Adam H Offenhartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Horizon Kinetics LLC
Represented By: Russell H Falconer
Represented By: Peter M Wade
Represented By: Tyler Hancock Amass
Represented By: Aric W Wu
Represented By: Luke A Dougherty
Represented By: Olivia Arden Adendorff
Represented By: Robert C Walters
Represented By: Adam H Offenhartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: SoftVest LP
Represented By: Russell H Falconer
Represented By: Peter M Wade
Represented By: Tyler Hancock Amass
Represented By: Aric W Wu
Represented By: Luke A Dougherty
Represented By: Olivia Arden Adendorff
Represented By: Robert C Walters
Represented By: Adam H Offenhartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: ART-FGT Family Partners Limited
Represented By: Russell H Falconer
Represented By: Peter M Wade
Represented By: Tyler Hancock Amass
Represented By: Aric W Wu
Represented By: Luke A Dougherty
Represented By: Olivia Arden Adendorff
Represented By: Robert C Walters
Represented By: Adam H Offenhartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?