SendSig LLC v. E La Carte Inc

Plaintiff: SendSig LLC
Defendant: E La Carte Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01258
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Referring Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER GRANTING STAY AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASEBefore the Court is the Parties' Joint Stipulation to Stay all Deadlines Pending Dismissal, filed on July 16, 2019. The Motion is GRANTED and this case is hereby STAYED. There appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the file as open for statistical purposes. The Clerk is therefore instructed to submit a JS-6 form to the Administrative Office, thereby removing this case from the statistical records. Nothing in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this case. The Parties are DIRECTED to file Dismissal Papers within 30 days from the date of this order. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/22/2019) (chmb)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines Pending Dismissal filed by SendSig LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kudlac, Kevin)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Stipulation filed on June 18, 2019. Construed as a motion, the motion is hereby GRANTED. E La Carte Inc Answer or Response due no later than 7/18/2019. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/18/2019) (chmb)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 First STIPULATION For Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by SendSig LLC. (Kudlac, Kevin)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to E La Carte Inc ; served on 5/28/2019. (Kudlac, Kevin)
May 28, 2019 Judge Ed Kinkeade added pursuant to Special Order 3-287. Judge Karen Gren Scholer no longer assigned to case. (ewd)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (aaa)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to E La Carte Inc. (aaa)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (aaa)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff SendSig LLC. (Skeels, David)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by SendSig LLC. (Skeels, David)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SendSig LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Intelleq Holdings, LLC for SendSig LLC. (Skeels, David)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against E La Carte Inc filed by SendSig LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10010320) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Patent) (Skeels, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SendSig LLC v. E La Carte Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E La Carte Inc
Represented By: Todd Noah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SendSig LLC
Represented By: David A Skeels
Represented By: Enrique Sanchez, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer Tatum Lee
Represented By: Cabrach John Connor
Represented By: Kevin Sean Kudlac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?