Brennan et al v. City of Mesquite Texas et al
Plaintiff: Alyssa Sanders, Patricia Brennan and Heirs of Natalie Sanders
Defendant: Layton Winters, Victor Palascios, City of Mesquite, Texas, Michael Kelly, Sherry Green, Marcelet Martin and Kyle Stone
Case Number: 3:2019cv01263
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Response to #22 Amended Complaint per 24 Electronic Order due from City of Mesquite Texas, Sherry Green, Michael Kelly, Marcelet Martin, Victor Palascios, Kyle Stone, Peter Velasquez, Layton Winters on 7/24/2019. (ykp)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #23 Motion to Extend Time. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendants to file a response to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is 7/24/2019. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 7/12/2019) (chmb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 23 Agreed MOTION to Extend Time respond to amended complaint filed by City of Mesquite Texas, Sherry Green, Michael Kelly, Marcelet Martin, Victor Palascios, Kyle Stone, Peter Velasquez, Layton Winters (Tooley, Joe)
July 3, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Alyssa Sanders, Patricia Brennan. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hutchison, Susan)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND STATUS REPORT: Joint Status Report due by 7/23/2019. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/21/2019) (mla)
June 20, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by City of Mesquite Texas, Sherry Green, Michael Kelly, Marcelet Martin, Victor Palascios, Kyle Stone, Peter Velasquez, Layton Winters. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Tooley, Joe)
June 20, 2019 Filing 19 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by City of Mesquite Texas, Sherry Green, Michael Kelly, Marcelet Martin, Victor Palascios, Kyle Stone, Peter Velasquez, Layton Winters. (Tooley, Joe)
June 20, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by City of Mesquite Texas, Sherry Green, Michael Kelly, Marcelet Martin, Victor Palascios, Kyle Stone, Peter Velasquez, Layton Winters. (Tooley, Joe)
June 20, 2019 Filing 17 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Sherry Green, Michael Kelly, Marcelet Martin, Victor Palascios, Kyle Stone, Peter Velasquez, Layton Winters re #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Tooley, Joe)
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sherry Green, Michael Kelly, Marcelet Martin, Victor Palascios, Kyle Stone, Peter Velasquez, Layton Winters Attorney Joe C Tooley added to party Sherry, Green(pty:dft), Michael Kelly(pty:dft), Marcelet Martin(pty:dft),Victor Palascios(pty:dft),Kyle Stone(pty:dft),Peter Velasquez(pty:dft), Layton Winters(pty:dft) (Tooley, Joe) Modified text on 6/21/2019 (ykp).
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by City of Mesquite Texas re #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Tooley, Joe)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of Mesquite Texas Attorney Joe C Tooley added to party City of Mesquite Texas(pty:dft) (Tooley, Joe)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Answer Date by City of Mesquite Texas, Sherry Green, Michael Kelly, Marcelet Martin, Victor Palascios, Kyle Stone. (Tooley, Joe)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to City of Mesquite Texas, Sherry Green, Michael Kelly, Marcelet Martin, Victor Palascios, Kyle Stone, Peter Velasquez, Layton Winters. (axm)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to issue Summons to Winters filed by Patricia Brennan, Alyssa Sanders. (Hutchison, Susan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Patricia Brennan, Alyssa Sanders. (Hutchison, Susan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to issue Summons to Stone filed by Patricia Brennan, Alyssa Sanders. (Hutchison, Susan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to issue Summons to Palasciano filed by Patricia Brennan, Alyssa Sanders. (Hutchison, Susan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to issue Summons to Martin filed by Patricia Brennan, Alyssa Sanders. (Hutchison, Susan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to issue Summons to Kelly filed by Patricia Brennan, Alyssa Sanders. (Hutchison, Susan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to issue Summons to Sherry Green filed by Patricia Brennan, Alyssa Sanders. (Hutchison, Susan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Patricia Brennan, Alyssa Sanders. (Hutchison, Susan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Patricia Brennan, Alyssa Sanders. (Hutchison, Susan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Alyssa Sanders, Patricia Brennan, Heirs of Natalie Sanders. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10011008) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Hutchison, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brennan et al v. City of Mesquite Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Layton Winters
Represented By: Joe C Tooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Palascios
Represented By: Joe C Tooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Mesquite, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kelly
Represented By: Joe C Tooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Green
Represented By: Joe C Tooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcelet Martin
Represented By: Joe C Tooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Stone
Represented By: Joe C Tooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Sanders
Represented By: Susan E Hutchison
Represented By: James Robert Hudson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Brennan
Represented By: Susan E Hutchison
Represented By: James Robert Hudson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heirs of Natalie Sanders
Represented By: Susan E Hutchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?