McElvy et al v Southwestern Correctional LLC et al

Plaintiff: Kyra McElvy, Tina McElvy and Gregory McElvy
Defendant: Southwestern Correctional LLC, Chris Eller, Danielle Kacho, Joann Russell, Kelli Burk, Lillian Delaine Hinojosa and Jane Doe 1-5
Case Number: 3:2019cv01264
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Kelli Burk, Jane Doe 1-5, John Doe 1-5, Chris Eller, Lillian Delaine Hinojosa, Danielle Kacho, LaSalle Management Company LLC, Joann Russell, Southwestern Correctional LLC, Eddie Williams filed by Gregory McElvy, Sr, Kyra McElvy, Tina McElvy. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G) (Lippe, Emil)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendants, LaSalle Management Company LLC and Southwestern Correctional LLC's response to the complaint is due 8/9/2019. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/3/2019) (chmb)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by LaSalle Management Company LLC, Southwestern Correctional LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Marvin C Moos added to party LaSalle Management Company LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Marvin C Moos added to party Southwestern Correctional LLC(pty:dft) (Moos, Marvin)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to LaSalle Management Company LLC; served on 6/10/2019. (Lippe, Emil)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kelli Burk, Chris Eller, Danielle Kacho, LaSalle Management Company LLC, Joann Russell, Southwestern Correctional LLC, Eddie Williams. (aaa)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue SUMMONS filed by Gregory McElvy, Kyra McElvy, Tina McElvy. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s), #3 Additional Page(s), #4 Additional Page(s), #5 Additional Page(s), #6 Additional Page(s)) (Lippe, Emil)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (aaa)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gregory McElvy, Kyra McElvy, Tina McElvy. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Lippe, Emil)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Plaintiffs filed by Kyra McElvy, Gregory McElvy, Tina McElvy. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10011034) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G) (Lippe, Emil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McElvy et al v Southwestern Correctional LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyra McElvy
Represented By: Emil Lippe, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina McElvy
Represented By: Emil Lippe, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory McElvy
Represented By: Emil Lippe, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Correctional LLC
Represented By: Marvin C Moos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Eller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Kacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joann Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelli Burk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lillian Delaine Hinojosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?