Brown v. US Department of Defense et al

Plaintiff: Michael Keith Brown
Defendant: Town of Addison Texas, City of Dallas, Department of Treasury, US Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Dallas Area Rapid Transit, AT&T Corporation and Mesquite Municipal/Government
Case Number: 3:2019cv01267
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Referring Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 13, 14. Wed Jul 10 08:28:25 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JUDGMENT: The complaint is DISMISSED as frivolous under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/9/2019) (zkc)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Accepting #10 Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. Further, the Plaintiff filed an Amended Complaint on 7/3/2019, seeking to add Defendants Dallas Area Rapid Transit, Department of Justice, AT&T Corporation, Mesquite Municipal/Government and remove Town of Addison Texas, US Department of Defense, City of Dallas and Department of Treasury. After due consideration, the Court finds that this action is still subject to dismissal with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). This case is patently frivolous. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/9/2019) (zkc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #10 Findings and Recommendations by Michael Keith Brown. (axm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 (AMENDED) COMPLAINT against Dallas Area Rapid Transit, Department of Justice, AT&T Corporation, Mesquite Municipal/Government filed by Michael Keith Brown. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (axm)
July 3, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. Wed Jul 3 09:50:49 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Plaintiff Michael Brown, proceeding pro se and in forma pauperis, filed this civil action alleging violations of his civil rights. The Court should summarily dismiss Plaintiff's complaint with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). (see order) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 7/2/2019) (mcrd) Modified date on 7/3/2019 (epm).
June 27, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Thu Jun 27 12:28:25 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of the Court SHALL NOT ISSUE SUMMONS or take any further action pending judicial screening. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 6/27/2019) (svc)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 Addendum 2B to #3 Complaint by Plaintiff Michael Keith Brown. (ykp)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Hearing re #3 Complaint filed by Michael Keith Brown (ykp)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 Addendum to #3 Complaint by Plaintiff Michael Keith Brown. (ykp)
May 28, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Tue May 28 15:22:19 CDT 2019 (crt)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Keith Brown (ykp)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Michael Keith Brown. (ykp)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against City of Dallas, Dallas Area Rapid Transit, Department of Justice, Department of Treasury, Town of Addison Texas, US Department of Defense filed by Michael Keith Brown. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ykp)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (ykp)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. US Department of Defense et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Addison Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Area Rapid Transit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesquite Municipal/Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Keith Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?