Koussa v. IRS/FBAR
Plaintiff: Ramsey A Koussa and Ramsey Adel Koussa
Defendant: IRS/FBAR
Case Number: 3:2019cv01271
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Referring Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:6703
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff paid the required filing fee in this case. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c), Plaintiff is now responsible for serving a summons and complaint on Defendants. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send summons forms, a copy of Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, and a copy of Local Rule 4.1 to Plaintiff. Plaintiff shall have 90 days from the date of this order to serve Defendants. After docketing of this Order, this case shall be referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford for further proceedings. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 6/27/2019) (Attachments: #1 Copy of Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, #2 Copy of Local Rule 4.1) (zkc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against IRS/FBAR filed by Ramsey Adel Koussa. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (zkc)
May 30, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 6. Thu May 30 13:33:32 CDT 2019 (crt)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court will defer ruling on Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis and will grant Plaintiff 30 days from the date of this order to pay the filing fee. Failure to pay the filing fee will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 5/30/2019) (zkc)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ramsey A Koussa. (zkc)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ramsey A Koussa. (zkc)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against IRS/FBAR filed by Ramsey A Koussa. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (zkc)
May 28, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 1, 2. Tue May 28 16:50:13 CDT 2019 (crt)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (zkc)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koussa v. IRS/FBAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramsey A Koussa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramsey Adel Koussa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRS/FBAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?