Greene v. Pacific Shore Property Management Inc et al

Plaintiff: Cedric Greene
Defendant: Jhonatan Gomez and Pacific Shore Property Management Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01282
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. Notice of Record on Appeal. Fri Jul 26 12:11:24 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 26, 2019 Record on Appeal for USCA5 19-10796 (related to #13 appeal): Record consisting of: 1 ECF electronic record on appeal (eROA) is certified,. PLEASE NOTE THE FOLLOWING: Licensed attorneys must have filed an appearance in the USCA5 case and be registered for electronic filing in the USCA5 to access the paginated eROA in the USCA5 ECF system. (Take these steps immediately if you have not already done so. Once you have filed the notice of appearance and/or USCA5 ECF registration, it may take up to 3 business days for the circuit to notify the district clerk that we may grant you access to the eROA in the USCA5 ECF system.) To access the paginated record, log in to the USCA5 ECF system, and under the Utilities menu, select Electronic Record on Appeal. Pro se litigants may request a copy of the record by #contacting the appeals deputy in advance to arrange delivery. (epm)
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 Transcript Order Form: re #13 Notice of Appeal, transcript not requested. Reminder to appellant: this document must also be filed with the appeals court. (zkc)
July 25, 2019 USCA Case Number 19-10796 in USCA5 for #13 Notice of Appeal, filed by Cedric Greene. (epm)
July 16, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13. T.O. Forms mailed also. Tue Jul 16 16:12:22 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #12 Judgment, #11 Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations, to the Fifth Circuit by Cedric Greene. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (mla)
July 8, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11,12. Mon Jul 8 15:30:35 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT: This action is DISMISSED without prejudice for improper venue. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/8/2019) (epm)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Accepting #9 Findings and Recommendations on Case re: #3 Complaint, filed by Cedric Greene. By separate judgment, this action will be dismissed without prejudice for improper venue. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/8/2019) (epm)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 OBJECTION filed by Cedric Greene re: #9 Findings and Recommendations on Case re: #3 Complaint. (aaa)
June 17, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Mon Jun 17 16:21:00 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION: This case should be DISMISSED without prejudice for improper venue. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 6/17/2019) (axm)
June 14, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Fri Jun 14 13:29:52 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 6/14/2019) (rekc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #3 Complaint, Claim for Relief, by Plaintiff Cedric Greene. (mla)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cedric Greene. (mla)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Request For Judicial Notice Under The Evidence Rule filed by Cedric Greene. (ndt)
June 3, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Mon Jun 3 14:04:27 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Cedric Greene must address the following deficiency: Pay the $400 filing fee or submit a fully completed and signed application to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 14 days. The Clerk of the Court shall mail the plaintiff a form application to proceed in forma pauperis. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 6/3/2019) (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (axm)
May 30, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Thu May 30 12:50:29 CDT 2019 (crt)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Jhonatan Gomez, Pacific Shore Property Management Inc filed by Cedric Greene. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ndt)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (ndt)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greene v. Pacific Shore Property Management Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jhonatan Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Shore Property Management Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?