Bey v. Officials and Public Servants of the Federal, State and City/County Municipal and Civil Laws and codes of the Land et al
Plaintiff: Linda Ann Bey
Defendant: State Police Commissioner, Officials and Public Servants of the Federal, State and City/County Municipal and Civil Laws and codes of the Land and State Department of Transportation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01284
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Mon Jun 3 08:45:30 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Linda Ann Bey must address the following deficiency: The plaintiff has not paid the filing fee for this case or submitted a request to proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiffs civil complaint does not comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 8(a). Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 14 days. The Clerk of the Court shall mail the plaintiff a form application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of Fed. R. Civ. P. 8. No process shall issue except upon order of the Court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 6/3/2019) (Attachments: #1 IFP, #2 Fed. R. Civ. P. 8) (axm)
May 31, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Fri May 31 10:47:11 CDT 2019 (crt)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Officials and Public Servants of the Federal, State and City/County Municipal and Civil Laws and codes of the Land, State Department of Transportation, State Police Commissioner filed by Linda Ann Bey. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (axm)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (axm)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm) Modified file date on 5/31/2019 (axm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bey v. Officials and Public Servants of the Federal, State and City/County Municipal and Civil Laws and codes of the Land et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Police Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officials and Public Servants of the Federal, State and City/County Municipal and Civil Laws and codes of the Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Ann Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?